blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3921333

EP3921333 - OPTIMIZED METHOD FOR INDUSTRIAL EXPLOITATION OF UNICELLULAR RED ALGAE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.11.2021
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fermentalg
4 rue Rivière
33500 Libourne / FR
[2021/50]
Inventor(s)01 / CAGNAC, Olivier
60 boulevard Beauséjour
33500 LIBOURNE / FR
02 / ATHANE, Axel
4 rue Pasteur
33560 CARBON BLANC / FR
03 / DEMOL, Julien
57 route de Paris
33500 LES BILLAUX / FR
04 / BROSSET-VINCENT, Sandra
11 Clairière du Raillon
33640 CASTRES-GIRONDE / FR
[N/P]
Former [2021/50]01 / CAGNAC, Olivier
33500 LIBOURNE / FR
02 / ATHANE, Axel
33560 CARBON BLANC / FR
03 / DEMOL, Julien
33500 LES BILLAUX / FR
04 / BROSSET-VINCENT, Sandra
33640 CASTRES-GIRONDE / FR
Representative(s)Icosa
83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau
75014 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2021/50]Be IP
Cabinet LTL SAS
Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation
56, Bd Niels Bohr
CS 52132
69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date20702668.307.02.2020
[2021/50]
WO2020EP53081
Priority number, dateFR2019000125908.02.2019         Original published format: FR 1901259
[2021/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020161280
Date:13.08.2020
Language:FR
[2020/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3921333
Date:15.12.2021
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/405, C12N1/06, C12N1/12, C12P17/18, A23L33/195
[2021/50]
CPC:
A23K10/16 (EP,US); C12P17/182 (EP,KR,US); C12N1/12 (EP,KR,US);
A23L17/60 (EP,KR,US); A23L29/256 (KR); A23L33/10 (EP);
A23L33/195 (EP,US); C07K14/405 (EP,US); C07K14/795 (EP,US);
C12N1/066 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/50]
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR INDUSTRIELLEN VERWERTUNG VON EINZELLIGEN ROTALGEN[2021/50]
English:OPTIMIZED METHOD FOR INDUSTRIAL EXPLOITATION OF UNICELLULAR RED ALGAE[2021/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ OPTIMISÉ D'EXPLOITATION INDUSTRIELLE D'ALGUES ROUGES UNICELLULAIRES[2021/50]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2021National basic fee paid 
30.08.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2021Examination requested  [2021/50]
30.08.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.02.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP3305370  (CHEMISCHES LABORATORIUM DR KURT RICHTER GMBH [DE]);
 [XI]WO2018178334  (FERMENTALG [FR]);
by applicantUS5817498
 US6074854
 US2006206946
 WO2009075682
 WO2017050917
 WO2017093345
 US2017159090
 WO2018178334
 FR20180057950
 FR20190000278
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.