EP3928349 - CVD REACTOR WITH MEANS FOR LOCALLY INFLUENCING THE SUSCEPTOR TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/52] | CVD REACTOR HAVING MEANS FOR LOCALLY INFLUENCING THE SUSCEPTOR TEMPERATURE | ||
[2023/35] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aixtron SE Dornkaulstrasse 2 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUFFER, Peter Sebald Rolandstr. 12 52070 Aachen / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
LAUFFER, Peter Sebald 52070 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20704519.6 | 10.02.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020EP53289 | Priority number, date | DE201910104433 | 21.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019104433 | [2021/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020169385 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3928349 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3928349 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/687, C23C16/458, H01L21/67, C23C16/46, // C23C16/455 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H01L21/68764 (EP,KR);
C23C16/4586 (EP,KR);
C23C16/46 (CN,US);
C23C16/45508 (EP,KR);
C23C16/4584 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/466 (EP,KR);
C23C16/52 (CN,US);
H01L21/67103 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67109 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H01L21/687, C23C16/46, H01L21/67, C23C16/458 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CVD-REAKTOR MIT MITTELN ZUR LOKALEN BEEINFLUSSUNG DER SUSZEPTORTEMPERATUR | [2021/52] | English: | CVD REACTOR WITH MEANS FOR LOCALLY INFLUENCING THE SUSCEPTOR TEMPERATURE | [2023/35] | French: | BÂTI CVD AVEC MOYENS DE MODIFICATION LOCALE DE LA TEMPÉRATURE DU SUPPORT | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/52] | CVD REACTOR HAVING MEANS FOR LOCALLY INFLUENCING THE SUSCEPTOR TEMPERATURE | ||
Former [2021/52] | RÉACTEUR DE DÉPÔT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR COMPRENANT DES MOYENS PERMETTANT D'INFLUER LOCALEMENT SUR LA TEMPÉRATURE DU SUSCEPTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 14.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24151152.6 / EP4328352 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5155336 (GRONET CHRISTIAN M [US], et al); | [A]US6001183 (GURARY ALEXANDER I [US], et al); | [A]DE10064942 (AIXTRON AG [DE]); | [XA]DE102007026348 (AIXTRON AG [DE]); | [XD]DE102009044276 (AIXTRON AG [DE]); | [A]US2012003389 (BRIEN DANIEL [DE], et al); | [AD]US8249436 (ADERHOLD WOLFGANG R [US], et al); | [A]US2018002830 (YUDOVSKY JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]DE102017105947 (AIXTRON SE [DE]) | by applicant | US5468299 | DE102005056536 | DE102009043960 | DE102009044276 | US8249436 | DE102011053498 | DE102011055061 | DE102013109155 | DE102014104218 | US2018182635 | DE102017105333 |