EP3891467 - METHOD FOR TESTING A QUALITY OF A WORKPIECE AND COMPUTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/41] | METHOD FOR CHECKING THE QUALITY OF A WORKPIECE, AND COMPUTING DEVICE | ||
[2022/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGHANI, Adel Mariannhillstraße 29 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20706960.0 | 12.02.2020 | [2021/41] | WO2020EP53519 | Priority number, date | EP20190157157 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19157157 | [2021/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020165197 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3891467 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3891467 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/30 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G01B21/30 (EP);
G01B21/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | G01B21/30, G01N19/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN EINER QUALITÄT EINES WERKSTÜCKS SOWIE RECHENEINRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING A QUALITY OF A WORKPIECE AND COMPUTING APPARATUS | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UNE QUALITÉ D'UNE PIÈCE ET DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL | [2022/18] |
Former [2021/41] | METHOD FOR CHECKING THE QUALITY OF A WORKPIECE, AND COMPUTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2021/41] | PROCÉDÉ POUR VÉRIFIER UNE QUALITÉ D'UNE PIÈCE ET DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 06.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | IE | 12.02.2023 | LU | 12.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
IE | 12.02.2023 | ||
LU | 12.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
LU | 12.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]JPH11281336 (RICOH KK) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019]; figures 2a-c *; | [AD]DE102015013607 (CATERPILLAR INC (N D GES D STAATES DELAWARE) [US]) [AD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0027]; figures 1-6; claims 1-7 *; | [AD] - E Rubio ET AL, "A Wavelet Approach to Estimate The Quality of Ground Parts", Journal of applied research and technology, (201202), pages 28 - 37, URL: http://www.scielo.org.mx/pdf/jart/v10n1/v10n1a4.pdf, (20190424), XP055582794 [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - XIANGYANG LIU ET AL, "Analyzing engineering surface texture using wavelet filter", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE MEDICAL IMAGING 1997, 1000 20th St. Bellingham WA 98225-6705 USA, (19961023), vol. 2825, doi:10.1117/12.255308, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-2781-9, pages 942 - 949, XP055582856 [A] 3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.255308 | [A] - S-H. LEE ET AL, "Morphological characterisation of engineered surfaces by wavelet transform", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MACHINE TOOLS AND MANUFACTURE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199806), vol. 38, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/S0890-6955(97)00105-3, ISSN 0890-6955, pages 581 - 589, XP055583028 [A] 3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0890-6955(97)00105-3 | [A] - GRZESIK W ET AL, "Wavelet and fractal approach to surface roughness characterization after finish turning of different workpiece materials", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 209, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.JMATPROTEC.2008.06.009, ISSN 0924-0136, (200903), pages 2522 - 2531, (20080614), XP025914746 [A] 3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmatprotec.2008.06.009 | by applicant | JPH11281336 | DE102015013607 |