EP3935263 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING OPERATION OF A MINING MACHINE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 NE Adams St. Peoria, IL 61629 / US | [2023/20] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states Caterpillar Global Mining Europe GmbH Industriestrasse 1 44534 Lünen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRKHOPE, Euan 41 Braye Street Mayfield, NSW 2304 / AU | 02 /
WESSELMANN, Johannes Caterpillar Global Mining Europe GmbH Industriestrasse 1 44534 Lünen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
KIRKHOPE, Euan Mayfield, NSW 2304 / AU | ||
02 /
WESSELMANN, Johannes 44534 Lünen / DE | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20710423.3 | 02.03.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020EP25108 | Priority number, date | GB20190002978 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: GB 201902978 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020177930 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935263 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21F13/00, E21C27/02, E21C35/14, E21D23/08, E21D23/12 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
E21C27/02 (EP,GB);
E21C35/04 (GB);
E21D23/144 (EP,GB,US);
E21C35/14 (EP,GB);
E21D23/0052 (US);
E21D23/006 (US);
E21D23/085 (EP,GB,US);
E21D23/12 (EP,GB,US);
E21D23/142 (EP,GB,US);
E21F13/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES BETRIEBS EINER BERGBAUMASCHINENEINHEIT | [2022/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING OPERATION OF A MINING MACHINE UNIT | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE UNITÉ DE MACHINE D'EXPLOITATION MINIÈRE | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1122952 (GEWERK EISENHUETTE WESTFALIA); | [XI]EP2536918 (CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING EUR [DE]); | [XI]US2017019641 (RAHMS PETER [DE], et al) |