blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: WO2020208524

WO2020208524 - NEEDLE OR CATHETER PROVIDED WITH A PLURALITY OF OPTICAL FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2022
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.10.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2022  [2022/16]
Applicant(s)For: 
CENTRO REGIONALE INFORMATION COMMUNICATION TECHNOL
Via Traiano Palazzo ex Poste Snc
82100 Benevento / IT
For: 
CUTOLO, Antonello
Via Zaro 7
80075 Forio-Ischia / IT
For: 
CUSANO, Andrea
Via Ferrarecce 75
81100 Caserta / IT
For: 
CONSALES, Marco
Via Avellino 22 D
82100 Benevento / IT
For: 
PISCO, Marco
Vico Castrucci 42
80137 Napoli / IT
For: 
ALIBERTI, Anna
Via Marconi 74
84088 Siano / IT
For: 
MICCO, Alberto
Via Enrico Fermi snc
82100 Benevento / IT
For: 
RICCIARDI, Armando
C.da Pezzapiana 18
82100 Benevento / IT
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / CUTOLO, Antonello
Via Zaro 7
80075 Forio-Ischia / IT
02 / CUSANO, Andrea
Via Ferrarecce 75
81100 Caserta / IT
03 / CONSALES, Marco
Via Avellino 22 D
82100 Benevento / IT
04 / PISCO, Marco
Vico Castrucci 42
80137 Napoli / IT
05 / ALIBERTI, Anna
Via Marconi 74
84088 Siano / IT
06 / MICCO, Alberto
Via Enrico Fermi snc
82100 Benevento / IT
07 / RICCIARDI, Armando
C.da Pezzapiana 18
82100 Benevento / IT
[N/P]
Application number, filing date20723209.107.04.2020
WO2020IB53314
Priority number, dateIT2019000536208.04.2019         Original published format: IT201900005362
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020208524
Date:15.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/00, A61B8/00, A61B18/18
CPC:
A61B5/6843 (EP); A61B18/24 (EP); A61B5/0053 (EP);
A61B5/0075 (EP); A61B8/00 (EP); A61B8/12 (EP);
A61B8/4416 (EP); A61B2017/00061 (EP); A61B2018/00577 (EP);
A61B2018/00601 (EP); A61B2018/00785 (EP); A61B2090/065 (EP);
A61B5/0095 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleEnglish:NEEDLE OR CATHETER PROVIDED WITH A PLURALITY OF OPTICAL FIBERS
French:AIGUILLE OU CATHÉTER POURVU D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE FIBRES OPTIQUES
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2022/16]
09.11.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/16]
30.11.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2022/16]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2018271491  (FLANAGAN AIDEN [IE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0052] , [0054] , [0061] , [0070] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2017191552  (ALIBERTI ANNA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, lines 22-29 *;
 [Y]EP2475977  (SENSA BUES AB [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0065] , [0067] , [0 82] , [0 83] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2013218019  (ABRAHAM THEODORE P [US]) [Y] 13,14 * paragraphs [0020] , [0076] , [0079] , [0089] *;
 [Y]US5951881  (ROGERS JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 11 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2008108867  (ZHOU GAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] * * figure 11 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.