EP3980717 - 3D LOCALIZATION AND MAPPING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLIR UNMANNED AERIAL SYSTEMS AS Nye Vakås vei 56 1395 Hvalstad / NO | For all designated states Flir Systems, Inc. 27700 SW Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, OR 97070 / US | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND, Jon Elvira Andres Nye Vakas Vei 56 1395 Hvalstad / NO | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20732434.4 | 26.05.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020US34585 | Priority number, date | US201962857225P | 04.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962857225 P | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020247212 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980717 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, G08G5/00, G05D1/10 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G01C21/3826 (EP,KR);
G01C21/00 (CN);
G08G5/0069 (EP,KR,US);
B64C39/024 (KR);
B64U20/87 (EP,CN,US);
G01C15/00 (CN);
G01C21/3837 (EP,KR);
G01D21/02 (CN);
G05D1/106 (EP,US);
G08G5/0013 (EP,KR);
G08G5/0021 (EP,KR,US);
G08G5/0026 (EP,KR);
G08G5/0086 (EP,KR);
B64U10/14 (EP,CN,US);
B64U10/25 (EP,CN,US);
B64U2101/30 (KR);
B64U2101/31 (EP,CN,US);
B64U2201/10 (EP,KR,US);
B64U2201/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIMULTANEN ORTUNG UND KARTIERUNG | [2022/15] | English: | 3D LOCALIZATION AND MAPPING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CARTOGRAPHIE ET DE LOCALISATION 3D | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 26.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]CN102023003 (UNIV TSINGHUA); | [I]WO2018039975 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [P]US2019187711 (XIE JIEBIN [CN], et al) |