EP3980704 - A NATURAL GAS LIQUEFACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Tecnologie S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci, 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2022/24] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Technologie S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci, 2 50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOCCIONI, Paolo Via Felice 2 50127 Florence / IT | 02 /
ZUCCHI, Oriano Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | 03 /
ALFANI, Andrea Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Baker Hughes 245 Hammersmith Chalk Hill Road London W6 8DW / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20732488.0 | 03.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020EP25261 | Priority number, date | IT20190008367 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: IT201900008367 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020244809 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980704 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
F25J1/0022 (EP);
F25J1/0012 (EP);
F25J1/004 (EP);
F25J1/0202 (EP);
F25J1/023 (EP);
F25J1/0251 (EP);
F25J1/0282 (EP);
F25J1/0283 (EP);
F25J1/0284 (EP);
F25J1/0287 (EP);
F25J2210/06 (EP);
F25J2240/80 (EP);
F25J2260/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | ERDGASVERFLÜSSIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/15] | English: | A NATURAL GAS LIQUEFACTION SYSTEM | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LIQUÉFACTION DE GAZ NATUREL | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 27.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US6449984 (PARADOWSKI HENRI [FR]) [X] 1,2 * all electrical drive LNG, electrical power from renewable source power plants (e.g. integrated in public grid); column 2 - column 3 * [Y] 9,10 [I] 3-6,12,13; | [X]WO2009153143 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11 * LNG refrigerant compressors driven directly by CSP turbine (solar power). Additionally CSP turbine also drives a generator producing electrical power used e.g. for a pump.; page 6, line 12 - page 12, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]GB2461101 (2OC [GB]) [Y] 9,10 * Renewable energy power plant/energy conversion; page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 11; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2,7; | [A]EP2330280 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-13 * CSP driven air chilling; paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [XY]EP2335813 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,2,8,11 * all electrical drive LNG, electrical power from CSP (solar power).; paragraphs [0044] , [0051] , [0052]; figure 1 * [Y] 9,10; | [YA]WO2013011313 (ELSARRAG ESAM [QA], et al) [Y] 9,10 * Power to hydrogen system by electric conversion using solar power;; figure 2A * [A] 1,2; | [A]JP2016211515 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1,2,7-11* Renewable energy power plant/energy conversion, in particular compressed air storage;; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2017013475 (MEHRPOOYA MEHDI [IR]) [A] 1-13 * LNG plant with hybrid energy generating unit including solar power. Hybrid energy generating unit provides electrical power and waste heat.;; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO2018206102 | - XING LUO et al., "Overview of current development in electrical energy storage technologies and application potential in power system operation", Applied Energy, vol. 137, doi:10.1016/j.apenergy.2014.09.081, (20150000), pages 511 - 536, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0306261914010290, XP029098557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apenergy.2014.09.081 | - "Intermittent wave energy generation system with hydraulic energy storage and pressure control for stable power output", Journal of marine Science and Technology, (20181200), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 802 - 813 | - T.J. HAM-MONS, Tidal Energy Technologies: Currents, Wave and offshore Wind Power in the United Kingdom, Europe and North America, URL: http://cdn.inte-chweb.org/pdfs/9342.pdf |