EP3999779 - CONSTANT-VOLUME TURBOMACHINE COMBUSTION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCURE, Didier René André c/o Safran CEPI Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
TANTOT, Nicolas Jérôme Jean c/o Safran CEPI Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/51] |
Former [2022/21] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20750326.9 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020FR51211 | Priority number, date | FR20190007970 | 15.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1907970 | [2022/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009439 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999779 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3999779 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F23R7/00, F02C5/12 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
F23R7/00 (EP,CN,US);
F02C5/12 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKAMMER EINER TURBOMASCHINE MIT KONSTANTEM VOLUMEN | [2022/21] | English: | CONSTANT-VOLUME TURBOMACHINE COMBUSTION CHAMBER | [2022/21] | French: | CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DE TURBOMACHINE A VOLUME CONSTANT | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 18.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2579321 (GUERCKEN NINA K) [X] 1,5,6,8-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 18; figure - *; | [A]US2898736 (ELY ROBERT F) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [I]US2928242 (EMMERICH GUENTHER) [I] 1-7 * column 3, lines 1-48; figures 1-3 *; | [I]GB1222272 (RENAULT [FR], et al) [I] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 46; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4570438 (LORENZ EDMUND [AT]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018356093 (PAL SIBTOSH [US], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document * |