EP4004636 - OPTICAL LENSES AND METHODS FOR MYOPIA CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Rochester 601 Elmwood Avenue, Box URV Rochester, NY 14642 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Geunyoung 4 Whittlers Ridge Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20753581.6 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US42488 | Priority number, date | US201962877912P | 24.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877912 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021016067 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004636 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04, G02C7/02 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G02C7/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02C7/027 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02C2202/24 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE LINSEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE VON MYOPIE | [2022/22] | English: | OPTICAL LENSES AND METHODS FOR MYOPIA CONTROL | [2022/22] | French: | LENTILLES OPTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CORRECTION DE LA MYOPIE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 04.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2005055891 (INST EYE RES [AU], et al); | US7025460 [ ] (SMITH EARL LEO [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2009129528 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | SG189792 [ ] (HOLDEN BRIEN VISION INST [AU], et al); | [XYI]WO2014059465 (HOLDEN BRIEN VISION INST [AU]); | [XYI]US2015219926 (FUJIKADO TAKASHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US7789910 | US8337553 | US8486055 | US8512320 | US8617147 |