EP4025678 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHELOR, Stephen, Norman Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
BURNHAM, Neil, Stephen Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 20761618.6 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74343 | Priority number, date | EP20190194932 | 02.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19194932 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043764 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025678 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025678 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D1/04 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
C11D3/2086 (EP);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D1/04 (EP);
C11D3/0036 (US);
C11D3/3715 (US);
C11D3/38618 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | C11D3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/28] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [2022/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DÉTERGENT | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/28] | COMPOSITION DÉTERGENTE | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 19.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2023 | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | ES | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0072953 (ASTION DEV APS [DK], et al) [I] 1-14 * examples 4, 18-26; claims 9,24 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 21 * * page 27, line 16 - page 28, line 23 *; | [A]US2008051472 (KWETKAT KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 5 *; | [I]WO2010062080 (KIM YOUNG BAE [KR]) [I] 1-14 * page 23, line 1 - page 26, line 10 * * page 1, paragraph 1 *; | [XI]US2014323379 (MUSSMANN NINA [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * claims 1,2,4,6-8 * * page 1, paragraphs 0016-0021 * * page 4, paragraph 0072 - page 5, paragraph 0080 * * page 7, paragraphs 0099-101,0104,0105 * * page 8, paragraph 0109 * [I] 8; | [XPI]WO2020058090 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XP] 1-7,9,10,13,14 * claims 1,7,11-13 * * page 12, lines 19-20 * * page 13, lines 1-4 * [I] 11,12; | [XPI]WO2020058096 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XP] 1-7,9,10,13,14 * claims 1,7,8,12 * * page 14, line 21 * * page 15, lines 3-6 * [I] 11,12; | [XPI]WO2020058088 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XP] 1-7,9,10,13,14 * claims 1,2,8,10 * * page 14, lines 18-19,35 * * page 15, lines 3-4 *[I] 12 | by applicant | GB1296839 | GB1372034 | US4435307 | EP0218272 | EP0258068 | EP0260105 | US4760025 | EP0305216 | JPS6474992 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | WO8909259 | EP0384070 | EP0407225 | WO9116422 | WO9205249 | WO9217517 | WO9219709 | WO9219708 | WO9318140 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9425583 | WO9425578 | WO9506720 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9526397 | WO9530744 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | US5648263 | US5679630 | US5691178 | WO9812307 | WO9815257 | US5776757 | WO0060060 | WO0060063 | WO0116285 | US6312936 | WO0216547 | WO0226024 | WO2005003274 | WO2005040372 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | WO2006027086 | WO2006032327 | WO2006032397 | WO2006045275 | US7262042 | WO2008017570 | WO2008087497 | WO2008141880 | WO2009021867 | WO2009087524 | WO2009090576 | WO2009107091 | WO2009111258 | WO2009132870 | WO2009141173 | WO2009148983 | WO2010099997 | WO2010102861 | WO2010148624 | WO2010151906 | WO2011011799 | WO2011047987 | WO2012054820 | WO2012054058 | WO2012119859 | WO2013142495 | WO2013151970 | WO2014029479 | WO2016005338 | WO2018085211 | WO2019008036 | WO2019007636 | WO2019075149 | - DARTOIS et al., Biochemica et Biophysica Acta, (19930000), vol. 1131, pages 253 - 360 | - POUCHER, Journal of the Society of Cosmetic Chemists, (19550000), vol. 6, no. 2, page 80 | - SIEZEN et al., Protein Engng., (19910000), vol. 4, pages 719 - 737 | - SIEZEN et al., Protein Science, (19970000), vol. 6, pages 501 - 523 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 172780-03-9 |