EP4041836 - ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certoplast Technische Klebebänder GmbH Müngstener Straße 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEERMANN, Timo Erbschlöer Straße 77 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
RAMBUSCH, René August-Jung-Weg 10 42113 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20774905.2 | 10.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP75392 | Priority number, date | DE201920105635U | 11.10.2019 Original published format: DE 202019105635 U | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069174 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041836 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/21, C08G63/183, C08L67/00, D03D3/00, D03D13/00, D03D15/00, D03D1/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
D03D15/283 (EP,CN,US);
C09J7/21 (EP,CN,US);
D03D1/0035 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (EP);
C08L67/00 (EP);
C09J7/35 (US);
D03D13/00 (CN);
D03D13/004 (EP);
D03D3/005 (EP);
C09J2203/302 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2301/304 (US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,US);
C09J2421/00 (US);
C09J2423/04 (US);
C09J2433/00 (US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2471/00 (US);
C09J2477/006 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Validation states | MA | 06.04.2022 | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND | [2022/33] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE | [2022/33] | French: | RUBAN ADHÉSIF | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE202019100588U (CERTOPLAST TECHNISCHE KLEBEBAENDER GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] , [0018] , [0019] , [0021] - paragraph [0023]; claims 1-3,6,9,10,13 *; | [Y]EP3514211 (CERTOPLAST TECHNISCHE KLEBEBAENDER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - paragraph [0017]; claim - * | by applicant | DE1710320 | DE60031332T | EP1911633 | DE202019100588U |