EP4077094 - DEVICE FOR ACTUATING THE LOCK OF AN AUTOMATIC MIDDLE BUFFER COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINKAMPF, Andy Leipziger Str. 20 38300 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 02 /
HÜBNER, Eva-Marie Im Finkenhof 2 37181 Hardegsen / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Voith Patent GmbH - Patentabteilung St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20776085.1 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP75708 | Priority number, date | DE201910134906 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019134906 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121692 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077094 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4077094 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B61G3/14 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B61G3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄTIGEN DES VERSCHLUSSES EINER AUTOMATISCHEN MITTELPUFFERKUPPLUNG | [2022/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACTUATING THE LOCK OF AN AUTOMATIC MIDDLE BUFFER COUPLING | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT DE LA SERRURE D'UN COUPLAGE TAMPON INTERMÉDIAIRE AUTOMATIQUE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1149751 (KNORR BREMSE BR SYSTEME FUER S [DE]); | [A]EP1894808 (SCHWAB VERKEHRSTECHNIK AG [CH]); | [A]WO2012169959 (EGO INT BV [BE], et al); | [XI]CN206589896U (BYD CO LTD) | by applicant | DE10020351 |