EP3925644 - POWER SUPPLY CONTROL CIRCUIT, AND MEDICAL LIQUID ADMINISTRATION DEVICE COMPRISING SAID POWER SUPPLY CONTROL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERUMO Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAKUSHIJI, Yusuke c/o TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1500 Inokuchi, Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
YAKUSHIJI, Yusuke Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20778434.9 | 26.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020JP07771 | Priority number, date | JP20190064560 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019064560 | [2021/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020195489 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925644 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3925644 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, A61M5/142 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G06F1/32 (EP);
G06F1/3228 (US);
A61M5/142 (EP);
G06F1/3287 (US);
G06F1/329 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | A61M5/142, G06F1/26, G06F1/3228, G06F1/3287, G06F1/329 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSSTEUERSCHALTUNG UND MEDIZINISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITSVERABREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DIESER STROMVERSORGUNGSSTEUERSCHALTUNG | [2021/51] | English: | POWER SUPPLY CONTROL CIRCUIT, AND MEDICAL LIQUID ADMINISTRATION DEVICE COMPRISING SAID POWER SUPPLY CONTROL CIRCUIT | [2021/51] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE LIQUIDE MÉDICAL COMPRENANT LEDIT CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2021 | Translation filed | 16.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05265599 (TOSHIBA TEC KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0028]; figure - * [I] 3-5,8,9; | [A]US2009153236 (KNEEPKENS FRANCISCUS ANTONIUS [AT], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0055]; figures 1-3,8 * | International search | [XA]JPH05265599 (TOKYO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1-2, 6-9 * paragraphs [0010]-[0030], fig. 1-2 * [A] 3-5; | [A]JPH10240392 (IBM) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0026][0054], fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JP2015128336 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009]-[0086], fig. 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2015181869 |