EP4033920 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PREGELATINIZED STARCH AND/OR PREGELATINIZED FLOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beneo, Remy Remylaan, 4 3018 Leuven-Wijgmaal / BE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVECKE, Bart Vestinglaan, 8 2860 Sint-Katelijne-Waver / BE | 02 /
DE VLEESCHOUWER, Kristel Sint-Antoniusstraat, 7 1910 Buken / BE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Koster, Nico Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V. Patent Department Aandorenstraat 1 3300 Tienen / BE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20786252.5 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP76781 | Priority number, date | EP20190199285 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19199285 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058680 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033920 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/212, C08B1/00, C08B30/00, C08L3/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
C08B30/12 (EP);
A23L29/212 (EP,CN,US);
A23L29/219 (CN);
A23L7/198 (CN,US);
C08B30/18 (CN);
C08H99/00 (EP);
C08L3/02 (EP);
C08L3/04 (US);
C08L99/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08K5/092 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/032, A23V2300/24, A23V2300/10 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5118, A23V2250/032, A23V2300/24, A23V2300/10 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5118, A23V2300/24, A23V2300/10 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Validation states | KH | 02.03.2022 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORGELATINIERTER STÄRKE UND/ODER VORGELATINIERTEM MEHL | [2022/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PREGELATINIZED STARCH AND/OR PREGELATINIZED FLOUR | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'AMIDON PRÉGÉLATINISÉ ET/OU DE FARINE PRÉGÉLATINISÉE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 03.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3607394 (GERMINO FELIX JOSEPH, et al); | [XI]EP0108833 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]); | [Y]WO9622311 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]); | [Y]US5718770 (SHAH MANISH B [US], et al) |