EP3981580 - SCANNING CONTROL METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shining 3D Tech Co., Ltd. No. 1398 Xiangbin Road Wenyan Subdistrict Xiaoshan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311258 / CN | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Zhongwei No.1398 Xiangbin Road, Wenyan Subdistrict, Xiaoshan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311258 / CN | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20819156.9 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020CN94438 | Priority number, date | CN201910483144 | 04.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910483144 | [2022/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020244594 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981580 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3981580 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25, B29C64/386, G01B11/00, G01B11/24, B33Y50/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B33Y50/00 (EP,CN);
B29C64/386 (EP,CN);
G01B11/2522 (EP,US);
G01B2210/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | G01B11/25, G01B11/24, G01B11/00, B29C64/386, B33Y30/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/15] | B29C64/386, G01B11/24, G01B11/00, B33Y30/00, B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTASTSTEUERUNG, GERÄT UND SYSTEM, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROZESSOR | [2022/15] | English: | SCANNING CONTROL METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM, STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROCESSOR | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE BALAYAGE, SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCESSEUR | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | Translation filed | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 18.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013063731 (GASPARDO STEVEN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2015138320 (EL DAHER ANTOINE [US]); | [XY]US2017066193 (KIM JAE-HEAN [KR], et al); | [Y]US2017211930 (LEE DONG HOON [KR], et al); | International search | [A]JP2011086164 (ELIJAH & CO) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013063731 (GASPARDO STEVEN J [US], et al) [Y] 2-11 * description paragraphs 37-41, figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2016260250 (JOVANOVIC DEJAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [X]CN106996752 (3D SYSTEMS KOREA INC) [X] 1, 12-19 * specific embodiments, figures 1, 4a-4e *; | [Y]CN106996752 (3D SYSTEMS KOREA INC) [Y] 2-11 * specific embodiments, figures 1, 4a-4e *; | [X]CN107121062 (SUZHOU DIKA TEST TECH CO LTD) [X] 18, 19 * description paragraphs 6-24, figures 1-3 * |