EP3854517 - NOVEL HOLLOW SHAFT MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changshu Synergy Automobile Parts Co., Ltd. No.11, Chuangjin Industrial Park Zhitang Industrial Park Changshu Suzhou Jiangsu 215500 / CN | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWAHARA, Yasuhiro 22-21-801, Yashiki-cho Nishinomiya, Hyogo 662-0963 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Eggenfeldenerstraße 56 81929 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20827441.5 | 05.06.2020 | [2021/30] | WO2020CN94502 | Priority number, date | CN201910525970 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910525970 | [2021/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020253550 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854517 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00, B21J5/00, B21J5/12, B21K1/06, B21K1/12, F16C3/02, B60B35/08 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
B23P15/00 (EP,CN);
B21K1/063 (EP,US);
B21J5/008 (EP);
B21J5/02 (US);
B21J5/12 (EP,US);
B21K1/066 (EP,US);
B21K1/12 (EP);
B60B35/08 (EP);
F16C3/02 (EP);
B60B2310/208 (EP);
B60B2310/228 (EP);
B60B2310/232 (EP);
B60B35/04 (EP);
F16C2220/44 (EP);
F16C2223/10 (EP);
F16C2223/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | B23P15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLWELLEN | [2021/30] | English: | NOVEL HOLLOW SHAFT MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2021/30] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ARBRE CREUX | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2021 | Translation filed | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 27.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102012005106 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0024] , [0028] , [0033] , [0034] , [0051] - [0067] - [0070]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1745870 (JOHANN HAY GMBH & CO KG AUTOMO [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,4,5 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] - [0022] - [0033] - [0034] - [0037] *; | [Y]CN103350346B (JIANGSU WINNER MACHINERY CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-2 * * the whole document *; | [A]TW201412429 (TWDT PREC CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] - [0021] - [0022] - [0029] * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]DE102005052178 (V&M DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] - [0035] - [0036] * | International search | [PX]CN110091138 (CHANGSHU XINAJI AUTOMOBILE COMPONENTS CO LTD) [PX] 1-2, * specific embodiments, and figures *; | [Y]CN108127339 (JIANGYIN YONGXING MACHINERY MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, * description, paragraph 28 *; | [Y]CN105666047 (UNIV CHONGQING ARTS & SCIENCES) [Y] 1-2, * description paragraphs 30-47, figures 1-2 *; | [Y]CN102248381 (HUASHENG YING) [Y] 1-2, * description paragraphs 37-48, figure 1 *; | [A]CN201461718U (ZHIGANG LIU) [A] 1-2, * entire document *; | [A]JP2009250418 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-2, * entire document *; | [A]DE69531225T (MATSUI UNIVERSAL JOINT MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1-2, * entire document *; | [A]JPH05329715 (AISIN EE I KK) [A] 1-2, * entire document *; | [A]KR101302392B (YOONSUNGTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-2, * entire document *; | [A]GB813301 (SCHOELLER BLECKMANN STAHLWERKE) [A] 1-2, * entire document * |