EP3993276 - GAIN ADJUSTMENT CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/42] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOU, Wei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Jun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LI, Gang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LI, Jun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
XIANG, Fei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Zoli, Filippo Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20837132.8 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN91034 | Priority number, date | CN201910605821 | 05.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910605821 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021004164 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993276 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3993276 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H04B1/16, H03G3/30 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
H04B1/16 (EP,CN);
H04B1/12 (CN);
H04W52/52 (US);
H03G3/3078 (EP);
H04B1/10 (EP);
H04W52/0245 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | H04B1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND GERÄT ZUR VERSTÄRKUNGSEINSTELLUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/18] | English: | GAIN ADJUSTMENT CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE RÉGLAGE DE GAIN, ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2022 | Translation filed | 25.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2663140 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]); | [XI]WO2018153043 (SANECHIPS TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [X]CN102594275 (INST OF MICROELECTRONICS CAS) [X] 1-13 * description, paragraphs [0028]-[0073], and figures 1-5 *; | [A]US8948611 (ZOCHER ANDREW GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-13* entire document *; | [X]CN104703272 (SUZHOU SIYUANTONG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * description, paragraphs [0015]-[0028] *; | [X]CN106612533 (REALTEK SEMICONDUCTOR CORP) [X] 1-13 * description paragraphs [0004]-[0007], [0030]-[0057], figures 2-8 *; | [X]CN107086859 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [X] 1-13 * description, paragraphs [0022]-[0039] * |