EP3933890 - INDIUM PHOSPHIDE SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INDIUM PHOSPHIDE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 10-4, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8417 / JP | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITANI, Kenya c/o Isohara Works JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 187-4,Usuba,Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | 02 /
KURITA, Hideki c/o Isohara Works JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 187-4,Usuba,Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Hideaki c/o Isohara Works JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 187-4,Usuba,Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
ITANI, Kenya Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | ||
02 /
KURITA, Hideki Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | |||
03 /
HAYASHI, Hideaki Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | Representative(s) | Yeadon IP Limited Nexus Discovery Way Leeds LS2 3AA / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20846284.6 | 26.05.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020JP20789 | Priority number, date | JP20190138231 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019138231 | [2022/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019887 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933890 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/304, H01L21/306, H01L21/02, C30B29/40 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C30B33/00 (EP);
H01L21/02019 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0657 (US);
B24B7/228 (EP,KR);
B24B9/065 (EP,KR);
B28D5/0058 (KR);
C30B29/40 (EP,KR);
C30B33/10 (EP);
H01L21/02005 (EP);
H01L21/02013 (KR);
H01L21/02021 (KR,US);
H01L21/02024 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H01L21/304, H01L21/306, C30B29/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | INDIUMPHOSPHIDSUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES INDIUMPHOSPHIDSUBSTRATS | [2022/01] | English: | INDIUM PHOSPHIDE SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INDIUM PHOSPHIDE SUBSTRATE | [2022/01] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE PHOSPHURE D'INDIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT DE PHOSPHURE D'INDIUM | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2021 | Translation filed | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5279077 (MIYASHITA MOTOHARU [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]US2012058581 (TSUJI YUKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 8,9* abstract * | International search | [EX]JPH041417B (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORPORATION) [EX] 8-9* , claims 1-2 *; | [YA]JP2001267235 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraph [0004] * [A] 8-9; | [YA]JP2003100575 (NIKKO MATERIALS CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0020]-[0024], fig. 1 * [A] 8-9 | by applicant | JP2014028723 |