EP3940824 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK AND DEVICE RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Chengdu No.2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Yuzhen No.2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
GUAN, Yingjie No.2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
WEN, Yan No.2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
HUANG, Qisen No.2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/22] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
LIANG, Chengdu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHAO, Yuzhen Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
GUAN, Yingjie Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
WEN, Yan Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
05 /
HUANG, Qisen Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20847834.7 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020CN103346 | Priority number, date | CN201910688516 | 29.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910688516 | [2022/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021017956 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940824 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3940824 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/48, H01M4/58 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
H01M4/483 (EP,KR);
H01M4/366 (KR);
H01M4/362 (EP,CN);
C01B33/18 (US);
C01B33/113 (EP);
C09C1/3072 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M10/4235 (EP,CN);
H01M4/0471 (EP);
H01M4/485 (CN);
H01M4/5815 (EP);
H01M4/5825 (EP);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/622 (EP,CN);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2002/74 (US);
C01P2002/82 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (US);
C01P2004/60 (EP);
C01P2006/10 (EP);
C01P2006/11 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M2004/021 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | H01M4/36, H01M4/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEGATIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL, DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU | [2022/03] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK AND DEVICE RELATED THERETO | [2022/03] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE, MODULE DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ À CELUI-CI | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2021 | Translation filed | 15.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | IE | 21.07.2023 | LU | 21.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.07.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004155938 (SUMITOMO DOW LTD) [A] 1-15* Example 1 * |