EP4011378 - USE OF MANNURONIC ACID OLIGOSACCHARIDES OR COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME IN TREATMENT OF TH1-DOMINANCE RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Green Valley Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 421 Niudun Road Zhang Jiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Shanghai Institute Materia Medica, Chinese Academy Of Sciences 555 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang Pudong, Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENG, Meiyu 555 Zuchongzhi Road, Zhang Jiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Guangqiang 421 Niudun Road, Zhang Jiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xinyi 421 Niudun Road, Zhang Jiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Jing 421 Niudun Road, Zhang Jiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
FENG, Teng 421 Niudun Road, Zhang Jiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20849500.2 | 05.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020CN107225 | Priority number, date | CN201910719369 | 06.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910719369 | [2022/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023239 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011378 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/702, A61P3/10, A61P19/02 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
A61P1/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K31/702 (KR,US);
A61K31/734 (CN,KR,US);
A61K31/7032 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P15/00 (EP,CN);
A61P17/00 (EP,CN);
A61P19/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (KR);
A61P25/28 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN);
A61P37/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MANNURONSÄURE-OLIGOSACCHARIDEN ODER DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN MIT TH1-DOMINANZ | [2022/24] | English: | USE OF MANNURONIC ACID OLIGOSACCHARIDES OR COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME IN TREATMENT OF TH1-DOMINANCE RELATED DISEASES | [2022/24] | French: | UTILISATION D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES D'ACIDE MANNURONIQUE OU COMPOSITION LES COMPRENANT DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ASSOCIÉES À LA DOMINANCE TH1 | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2022 | Translation filed | 21.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 16.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8835403 (GENG MEIYU [CN], et al) [X] 1,4,5,13-26 * claim 9 * [I] 1-26; | [XI]WO2018121559 (SHANGHAI GREEN VALLEY PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0010] , [0139] * * example 5 *[I] 25; | [XP]WO2020001632 (SHANGHAI GREEN VALLEY PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [XP] 1-26 * paragraphs [0008] , [0109] *; | [IP]WO2020001644 (SHANGHAI GREEN VALLEY PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [IP] 1-26 * paragraphs [0113] , [0114] *; | [E]EP4011379 (SHANGHAI GREEN VALLEY PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [E] 1-26 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 53] , [ 128] , [ 129] * * claim 1 *; | [T] - Imd Imd, "Analyse und Modulation der TH1/TH2-Zytokinbalance", (20230205), URL: https://www.imd-berlin.de/fileadmin/user_upload/Diag_Info/258_TH1TH2_Balance.pdf, (20230724), XP093066524 [T] 1-26 * the whole document * | [T] - Hepping Nico, "Promotion Nico Hepping", (20221030), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://opus.bibliothek.uni-wuerzburg.de/opus4-wuerzburg/frontdoor/deliver/index/docId/1856/file/Dissertation_Hepping_Teil_2.pdf, (20230724), XP093066528 [T] 1-26 * page 1 - page 3 * |