EP4021163 - AUTOMATED GROWING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agriforce Growing Systems Ltd. 300 - 2233 Columbia Street Vancouver BC V5Y 0M6 / CA | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Ingo c/o Agriforce Growing Systems Ltd. 777 Hornby Street Suite 600 Vancouver, British Columbia V6Z 1S4 / CA | 02 /
MCCLELLAN, Troy c/o Agriforce Growing Systems Ltd. 777 Hornby Street Suite 600 Vancouver, British Columbia V6Z 1S4 / CA | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20858811.1 | 26.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CA51161 | Priority number, date | US201962891562P | 26.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962891562 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035348 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021163 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/20, A01G9/24 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A01G9/047 (EP);
A01G31/06 (US);
A01G31/02 (EP);
A01G9/143 (EP);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE WACHSTUMSSYSTEME | [2022/27] | English: | AUTOMATED GROWING SYSTEMS | [2022/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CULTURE AUTOMATISÉS | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4337986 (HAUB JOHN T, et al); | [Y]EP0051647 ; | [XA]WO2018016609 (SPREAD CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US10058040 (DAAS KAMAL [NL], et al); | [A]US2019021249 (IVANESCU CRISTIAN [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR101488158B ; | [A]WO2016195472 (AUASIA AGROTECH SDN BHD [MY]); | [A]WO2019073073 (LETTUS GROW LTD [GB]) |