EP4026062 - PERFORMING PROCESSING-IN-MEMORY OPERATIONS RELATED TO PRE-SYNAPTIC SPIKE SIGNALS, AND RELATED METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Mailstop 1-507 Boise, Idaho 83707-0006 / US | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUDANOV, Dmitri 2330 Vehicle Dr. Apt 240 Cordova, California 95670 / US | 02 /
EILERT, Sean S. 1721 English Colony Way Penryn, California 95663 / US | 03 /
CASTRO, Hernan A. 3611 Meder Road Shingle Springs, California 95682 / US | 04 /
AKEL, Ameen D. 3408 Grappa Way Rancho Cordova, California 95670 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/28] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20861906.4 | 31.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020US48822 | Priority number, date | US201962896267P | 05.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962896267 P | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021046000 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026062 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/063, G06N3/04, G11C7/18, G11C8/08, G11C8/14 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
G11C7/1006 (EP,KR);
G06N3/049 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/063 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/084 (KR,US);
G06N3/088 (EP,KR);
G06N5/046 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNG VON SPEICHERINTERNEN VERARBEITUNGSVORGÄNGEN IN BEZUG AUF PRÄSYNAPTISCHE SPIKE-SIGNALE UND DAMIT VERBUNDENE VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME | [2022/28] | English: | PERFORMING PROCESSING-IN-MEMORY OPERATIONS RELATED TO PRE-SYNAPTIC SPIKE SIGNALS, AND RELATED METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2022/28] | French: | RÉALISATION D'OPÉRATIONS DE TRAITEMENT DANS UNE MÉMOIRE ASSOCIÉES À DES SIGNAUX IMPULSIONNELS PRÉSYNAPTIQUES, ET PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES ASSOCIÉS | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014129498 (BICHLER OLIVIER [FR], et al) [X] 1,12* paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0012] - [0127]; figures 1-13 *; | [X] - GUO YILONG ET AL, "Unsupervised Learning on Resistive Memory Array Based Spiking Neural Networks", FRONTIERS IN NEUROSCIENCE, vol. 13, doi:10.3389/fnins.2019.00812, (20190806), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6691091/pdf/fnins-13-00812.pdf, XP055786894 [X] 1-15 * pages 1-15; figures 1-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnins.2019.00812 | International search | [Y]US2012036099 (VENKATRAMAN SUBRAMANIAM [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,8,11-13,19,21 * paragraphs [0005], [0025]; claim 10; and figure 2 *; | [A]US2017017879 (KATAEVA IRINA [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0030]-[0080]; and figures 1-8B *; | [A]US2018260696 (SUDA NAVEEN [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0074]-[0141]; claims 1-9; and figures 4-18 *; | [Y]US2019005376 (AKIN BERKIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0016], [0030]; claims 1, 5; and figures 2, 5 *; | [Y]WO2019125421 (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0026], [0028], [0034]; claim 1; and figure 1 * |