EP4029538 - BIOCOMPATIBLE IMPLANT AND PREPARATION METHOD OF BIOCOMPATIBLE IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Takayuki c/o Kyocera Corporation, 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Taito c/o Kyocera Corporation, 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20862738.0 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP33973 | Priority number, date | JP20190165593 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019165593 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049494 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029538 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/30, A61L27/32, A61L27/54, A61L31/16, A61L31/08 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/32 (EP,US);
A61L31/086 (EP);
A61L31/16 (EP);
C23C4/04 (US);
C23C4/18 (US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (US);
A61L2300/63 (US);
A61L2400/12 (EP);
A61L2420/02 (EP,US);
A61L2420/04 (EP);
A61L2420/06 (US);
A61L2430/02 (EP);
A61L2430/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | A61L27/30, A61L27/32, A61L27/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | BIOKOMPATIBLES IMPLANTAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BIOKOMPATIBLEN IMPLANTATS | [2022/29] | English: | BIOCOMPATIBLE IMPLANT AND PREPARATION METHOD OF BIOCOMPATIBLE IMPLANT | [2022/29] | French: | IMPLANT BIOCOMPATIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN IMPLANT BIOCOMPATIBLE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2015138387 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]) [X] 1-12* figures 25-27; paragraphs 6, 7, 28-32, 78; example 4 *; | [XI]US2017119932 (MAWATARI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * claims 1-7; paragraphs 22-26; figure 1b; example 1 * [I] 13 | International search | [A]JP2002035107 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [A] 1-13 * 5, [0035] *; | [A]WO2008029612 (UNIV SAGA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * 1, 2, 4 *; | [A]JP2016536067 [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2017150539 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* [0022] *; | [A] - Murakami Takayuki, Noda Iwao, Nakahira Atsushi, Miyamoto Hiroshi, Mawatari Masaaki, "Evaluation of the structure of Ag in thermal sprayed Ag-containing hydroxyapatite coatings", Journal of the Ceramic Society of Japan, (20150000), vol. 123, no. 1440, ISSN 1348-6535, pages 667 - 671, XP055806238 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2109/jcersj2.123.667 | by applicant | JP6192014B |