EP4055217 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE OF NITROGEN AS A STABILIZATION GAS OF POLYACRYLONITRILE (PAN) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enevate Corporation 101 Theory, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONHOMME, Fred 22562 Cottonwood Circle Lake Forest, California 92630 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20885495.0 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US59365 | Priority number, date | US201962933034P | 08.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962933034 P | US202017090631 | 05.11.2020 Original published format: US202017090631 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021092348 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055217 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/54, D01F9/22, D01D1/02, H01M4/04, H01M4/38, H01M4/62, H01M4/66, H01M10/052 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M4/0471 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M4/134 (KR);
H01M4/386 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/622 (EP,KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/661 (EP,KR);
H01M4/667 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | D01F6/54, D01F9/22, D01D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG VON STICKSTOFF ALS STABILISIERUNGSGAS VON POLYACRYLNITRIL (PAN) | [2022/37] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE OF NITROGEN AS A STABILIZATION GAS OF POLYACRYLONITRILE (PAN) | [2022/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'UTILISATION D'AZOTE COMME GAZ DE STABILISATION DE POLYACRYLONITRILE (PAN) | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012141888 (BULAN ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2018083263 (CHO YOUNG TAI [KR], et al); | [XI]US2019267617 (EVANS TYLER [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO2016123718 (CHEN ZHONGWEI [CA], et al); | [A]US2018269480 (KIM KYOUNG [US], et al); | [X]US2019267617 (EVANS TYLER [US], et al) |