23.04.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.11.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.09.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.04.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2023 |
First examination report |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.02.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
27.01.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
27.01.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
19.11.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
18.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
18.11.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
29.07.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
02.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.05.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
26.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
29.05.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
29.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|