EP4053734 - HAND GESTURE ESTIMATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yang 2479 E Bayshore Rd, Suite 110 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 02 /
LIU, Jie 2479 E Bayshore Rd, Suite 110 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20891084.4 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020CN128205 | Priority number, date | US201962938193P | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938193 P | [2022/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021098573 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053734 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/10, G06V20/64, G06V10/82, G06V10/44, G06V10/80, G06T7/11, G06T7/73, G06T7/77 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G06T7/77 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06T7/50 (US);
G06T7/75 (EP,US);
G06V10/26 (EP,US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (US);
G06V10/7715 (US);
G06V10/809 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06V40/11 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP);
G06T2207/20076 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30201 (EP);
G06T2210/12 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDGESTENSCHÄTZUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/36] | English: | HAND GESTURE ESTIMATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ESTIMATION DE GESTE MANUEL, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2022 | Translation filed | 31.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - KAZAKOS EVANGELOS ET AL, "On the Fusion of RGB and Depth Information for Hand Pose Estimation", 2018 25TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20181007), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2018.8451022, pages 868 - 872, XP033454597 [X] 1-10,14,15 * abstract * * section 2 * * section 3 * [I] 11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2018.8451022 | [A] - BARDIA DOOSTI, "Hand Pose Estimation: A Survey", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190304), XP081369960 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - FANG LINPU ET AL, "Feature covariance matrix-based dynamic hand gesture recognition", NEURAL COMPUTING AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER LONDON, LONDON, vol. 31, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00521-018-3719-3, ISSN 0941-0643, (20180915), pages 8533 - 8546, (20180915), XP036922992 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00521-018-3719-3 |