EP4015483 - FLUORESCENT CERAMIC AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND PROJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.12.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YLX Incorporated Room 411-1 4th Floor, Shenzhen IC Design & Application Industrial Park Chaguang Road, Xili St., Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states Shenzhen Lighting Institute 23F-24F High-Tech Zone Union Tower No.63 Xuefu Road Nanshan District Sheenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qian 23F-24F High-Tech Zone Union Tower, No.63 Xuefu Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
JIAN, Shuai 23F-24F High-Tech Zone Union Tower, No.63 Xuefu Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yangang 23F-24F High-Tech Zone Union Tower, No.63 Xuefu Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Luppi Intellectual Property S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Savini, Stefania, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 20892446.4 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020CN131911 | Priority number, date | CN201911175951 | 26.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911175951 | [2022/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104399 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015483 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/10, H01S5/30 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
C04B35/117 (EP);
G03B21/204 (CN);
C04B35/10 (CN);
C04B35/622 (CN);
C04B35/645 (EP);
C04B38/0675 (EP);
C09K11/7774 (EP);
C04B2111/807 (EP);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3208 (EP);
C04B2235/3222 (EP);
C04B2235/3224 (CN);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/445 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/5454 (EP);
C04B2235/5463 (EP);
C04B2235/602 (CN);
C04B2235/604 (EP);
C04B2235/652 (EP);
C04B2235/656 (CN);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (CN);
C04B2235/6581 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/662 (CN);
C04B2235/663 (EP);
C04B2235/666 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP);
C04B35/6261 (EP);
C04B35/6342 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
Y02B20/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0675, C04B35/117 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDE KERAMIK UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND PROJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/25] | English: | FLUORESCENT CERAMIC AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND PROJECTION DEVICE | [2022/25] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE FLUORESCENTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, DISPOSITIF LUMINESCENT ET DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | Translation filed | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2016154220 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 11* whole document - see examples *; | [I]US2017160627 (IKESUE AKIO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]CN107474839 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD) [X] 1 * whole document - see embodiments - figure 1 * [Y] 1-15; | [A]WO2018095211 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] *; | [XY]WO2018223544 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD [CN]) [X] 1 * whole document - see examples and figures * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP3543221 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD [CN]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]EP3549923 (NICHIA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * examples; table 1; para.[0091], figure 3 * |