EP4072439 - INJECTION AND INFUSION SITE TREATMENT DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neodyne Biosciences, Inc. 47801 Fremont Blvd. Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPMAN, Kelley J. Livermore, California / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Jasper Newark, California / US | 03 /
ZEPEDA, John A. Los Altos, California / US | 04 /
WADLOW, Philip J. Campbell, California / US | 05 /
LASRADO, Reuben E. Campbell, California / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20899281.8 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020US64378 | Priority number, date | US201962946345P | 10.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962946345 P | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119360 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072439 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08, A61F13/02, A61M25/02, A61M39/02 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A61F13/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/085 (US);
A61M39/02 (EP,KR);
A61F2013/00412 (EP,KR);
A61M2025/0266 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INJEKTIONS- UND INFUSIONSSTELLEN | [2022/42] | English: | INJECTION AND INFUSION SITE TREATMENT DEVICES AND METHODS | [2022/42] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE SITE D'INJECTION ET DE PERFUSION | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5885254 (MATYAS MELANIE E [US]); | [A]US2013281904 (JACKSON JASPER [US], et al); | [A]WO2014021934 (NEODYNE BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) | International search | [A]US5885254 (MATYAS MELANIE E [US]) [A] 1-61* ; figures 3-4; column 2, lines 64-68; column 3, lines 15-25; column 4, lines 42-45 *; | [A]US2009326487 (VITARIS RONALD F [US]) [A] 1-61 * ; figures 1-3; paragraphs [0021]-[0023] *; | [A]US2013281904 (JACKSON JASPER [US], et al) [A] 1-61 * ; figure 3; paragraphs [0144]-[0145] *; | [A]KR20170116803 (LEE SANG WOON [KR]) [A] 1-61 * ; figures 4, 5; page 3, last and second to last paragraph; page 4, first paragraph - see machine translation * |