EP4063744 - AIR PURIFICATION MODULE AND KITCHEN APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Arcair Appliance Co., Ltd. No. 37, Shunxiang Road Daliang Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528318 / CN | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Haisheng No. 37 Shunxiang Road Daliang, Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528318 / CN | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Ipey Apex House Thomas Street Trethomas Caerphilly CF83 8DP / GB | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20905741.3 | 14.09.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020CN114991 | Priority number, date | CN201911367041 | 26.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911367041 | CN201922421396U | 26.12.2019 Original published format: CN 201922421396 U | [2022/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021128961 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063744 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20, B03C3/02, B03C3/34, B03C3/60, B03C3/86, B03C3/41, B03C3/38, B03C3/017, B03C3/155, B03C3/36, B03C3/011 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B03C3/155 (EP);
B03C3/011 (EP);
B03C3/017 (EP);
B03C3/368 (EP);
B03C3/38 (EP);
B03C3/41 (EP);
B03C3/60 (EP);
B03C3/86 (EP);
F24C15/2042 (EP);
B03C2201/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | F24C15/20, B03C3/02, B03C3/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGUNGSMODUL UND KÜCHENGERÄT | [2022/39] | English: | AIR PURIFICATION MODULE AND KITCHEN APPLIANCE | [2022/39] | French: | MODULE DE PURIFICATION D'AIR ET APPAREIL DE CUISINE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | Translation filed | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60114363 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]US2012269677 (ZHOU YUNZHENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103623664B (HU SHIXIONG) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN106885284 (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,5,6 * figure 4; claims 3,7 * [I] 7; | [E]WO2020187187 (GUANGDONG ARCAIR APPLIANCE CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document * |