EP3936305 - SCREEN FILM APPLYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen B2 Technology Co., Ltd. 2112, R&D Bldg, EVOC Valley, Gaoxin Rd Dongzhou Community, Guangming St Guangming Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Hongbing 2112, R&D Bldg, EVOC Valley, Gaoxin Rd Dongzhou Community, Guangming St, Guangming Dist Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
SHI, Hongbing Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20917868.0 | 05.02.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020CN74337 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021155510 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936305 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/02, B29C63/00, B29L31/34 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B29C63/02 (EP);
B29C63/0004 (EP);
B29C63/0047 (EP);
B29L2031/3437 (EP);
B29L2031/3475 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | B29C63/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON BILDSCHIRMFOLIEN | [2022/02] | English: | SCREEN FILM APPLYING DEVICE | [2022/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION DE FILM D'ÉCRAN | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2021 | Translation filed | 06.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN105438531 (FUTAIHUA IND (SHENZHEN) CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0035] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN207808477U (XU CHUANGKUN) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]CN110480999 (OPPO CHONGQING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0044] - [0074] ** figures 1-7 * | International search | [Y]CN105438531 (FUTAIHUA IND (SHENZHEN) CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 11-35, figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2016049742 (SOFTBANK COMMERCE & SERVICE CORP) [Y] 1, 8-10 * description, paragraphs 32-67, figures 1-7 *; | [A]KR101718084B (NEWVIT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [Y]CN207808477U (XU CHUANGKUN) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0014] and [0015], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN108748969 (JIANGMEN AIJIADE ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]CN208263434U (HUIZHOU FENGHUA ELECTRONIC DEV CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN109822880 (SHENZHEN PERFECT PROTECTIVE FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1, 8-10 * description, paragraphs 55-71, figures 1-6 *; | [Y]CN110480999 (OPPO CHONGQING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [Y] 2-7 * description, paragraphs 44-74, figures 1-7 *; | [E]CN210851314U (SHENZHEN B2 TECH CORP LTD) [E] 1, 8, 9 * description, paragraphs 32-69, figures 1-7 * |