EP4049987 - MANGANESE ZINC FERRITE WITH HIGH NEGATIVE-TEMPERATURE MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY AND LOW HIGH-TEMPERATURE LOSS, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengdian Group DMEGC Magnetics Co., Ltd. Hengdian Industrial Area Dongyang, Zhejiang 322118 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states Hengdian Group DMEGC Magnetics Co. Ltd. Hengdian Industrial Area Dongyang, Zhejiang 322118 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYU, Donghua Hengdian Industrial Area Dongyang, Zhejiang 322118 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20919900.9 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN101986 | Priority number, date | CN202010101797 | 19.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010101797 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021164191 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049987 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/34, H01F41/02, C04B35/38, C04B35/622, C04B35/634 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H01F1/344 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/2633 (CN);
C04B35/2658 (EP,US);
C04B35/265 (CN);
C04B35/622 (CN);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (US);
C04B35/62655 (US);
C04B35/62695 (EP,US);
C04B35/6303 (US);
C04B35/63416 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
H01F41/02 (CN);
H01F41/0246 (EP);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/3262 (CN);
C04B2235/3274 (US);
C04B2235/3275 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/3284 (CN);
C04B2235/3293 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/442 (US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (CN,US);
C04B2235/661 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | C04B35/38, C04B35/622, C04B35/634, H01F41/02, H01F1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | MANGAN-ZINK-FERRIT MIT HOHER NEGATIVER TEMPERATUR-MAGNETPERMEABILITÄT UND GERINGEM HOCHTEMPERATUR-VERLUST UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/35] | English: | MANGANESE ZINC FERRITE WITH HIGH NEGATIVE-TEMPERATURE MAGNETIC PERMEABILITY AND LOW HIGH-TEMPERATURE LOSS, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/35] | French: | FERRITE DE ZINC ET DE MANGANÈSE PRÉSENTANT UNE PERMÉABILITÉ MAGNÉTIQUE ÉLEVÉE À TEMPÉRATURE NÉGATIVE ET UNE FAIBLE PERTE À TEMPÉRATURE ÉLEVÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | Translation filed | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN103588472 (HENGDIAN GROUP DMEGC JSC LTD) [X] 1,3 * examples 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 2,4-10; | [A]CN107417269 (CHONGQING ZHENGFENG ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-10* claims 1-6 *; | [A]CN110128124 (HAINING LIANFENG MAGNET IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |