EP4120813 - TAPE GUIDE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASAKI, Masataka c/o Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 20924838.4 | 10.03.2020 | [2023/03] | WO2020JP10329 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021181522 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120813 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/02, H05K13/08, H05K13/04 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H05K13/087 (EP);
H05K13/0417 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/03] | H05K13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | BANDFÜHRUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/03] | English: | TAPE GUIDE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2023/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE GUIDE DE BANDE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2022 | Translation filed | 07.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2004149383 (BERGSTROM JOHAN [SE]) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0063]; figures 2-5,7A,7B * [Y] 2-16 [I] 16; | [Y]EP1796453 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5-11* paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0120]; figures 7,9 *; | [XYI]EP3041337 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [X] 1,12,13,15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-4,7,8,12,13 * [Y] 2-16 [I] 14; | [XY]WO2017109892 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-14 * [Y] 2-16 | International search | [A]JP2002533944 (MYDATA AUTOMATION AB) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0040]-[0045], fig. 4 *; | [A]JP2004165603 (FUJI MACHINE MFG) [A] 1-16 * , paragraph [0033], fig. 6 *; | [Y]JP2006108322 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 5-11 * , paragraphs [0064]-[0093], fig. 7 *; | [A]WO2015029124 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [A] 1-16; | [A]JP2015185634 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [A] 1-16 * , paragraph [0032], fig. 4 *; | [A]JP2015185633 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [A] 1-16* , paragraph [0031], fig. 4 *; | [XY]WO2017109892 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4, 12-16 * , paragraphs [0055]-[0071], fig. 1-14 * [Y] 5-11 | by applicant | WO2013157107 |