EP4049945 - CROSS BELT SORTING TROLLEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENGIC INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. No. 21 Jinye Road High-tech Zone Qingdao, Shandong 266000 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Bing Qingdaoshi, Shandong 266000 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Jinfei Qingdaoshi, Shandong 266000 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Chunyang Qingdaoshi, Shandong 266000 / CN | 04 /
LI, Mengteng Qingdaoshi, Shandong 266000 / CN | 05 /
YAO, Xiaofen Qingdaoshi, Shandong 266000 / CN | 06 /
ZOU, Shengguang Qingdaoshi, Shandong 266000 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Bayramoglu et al. Mira Office Kanuni Sultan Süleyman Boulevard 5387 Street Beytepe, floor 12, no:50 06800 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20937278.8 | 12.06.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN95700 | Priority number, date | CN202010473241 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010473241 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021237810 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049945 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4049945 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/24, B65G41/00, B07C3/08, B65G21/06, B07C5/36, B65G47/96 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B65G47/96 (EP,US);
B65G41/02 (KR);
B65G15/24 (CN);
B07C3/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B07C5/36 (EP,US);
B65G21/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | B65G15/24, B65G41/00, B07C3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUERBAND-SORTIERWAGEN | [2022/35] | English: | CROSS BELT SORTING TROLLEY | [2022/35] | French: | CHARIOT DE TRI À COURROIES TRANSVERSALES | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | Translation filed | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2300612 (CRISPLANT AS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN106622983 (JIN HOUNG FUH (CHUZHOU) CONVEYING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN206485919U (BEIJING JINGDONG SHANGKE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8* figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN108584327 (SHENZHEN HONGHE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN109956282 (KENGIC INTELLIGENT EQUIP CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [X]CN206485919U (BEIJING JINGDONG SHANGKE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-2 * see description, paragraphs 0039-0058, figures 1-14 *; | [A]JP2018122988 (SANKI ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * see entire document *; | [A]CN207932515U (WEIHAI NEWBEIYANG ZHENGQI ROBOT CO LTD) [A] 1-8* see entire document *; | [A]CN110605243 (SHANGHAI SHUANGCAIJI INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * see entire document *; | [A]CN210437918U (SUZHOU JIULI INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * see entire document *; | [A]CN210557477U (ANHUI 11TONG INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * see entire document *; | [A]CN210593839U (SUZHOU JIULI INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * see entire document *; | [E]CN111590314 (KENGIC INTELLIGENT EQUIP CO LTD) [E] 1-8 * see description, specific embodiments, and figures 1-11 * |