EP4204182 - SYSTEM FOR HOLD, CLAMP AND POSITION OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNC Ileri Teknoloji Mühendislik Sanayi ve Ticaret Limited Sirketi Istanbul Trakya Serbest Bölgesi Ferhatpasa Serbest Bölge Mh. Begonya Sk. No:10/22 Çatalca/Istanbul / TR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELLER, Yair Çatalca/ stanbul / TR | 02 /
GÖKI IK, Feza Çatalca/ stanbul / TR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 20951748.1 | 25.08.2020 | [2023/27] | WO2020TR50757 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022045990 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204182 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/14, B25J9/00, B23Q1/00, B23Q3/10 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0072 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q3/103 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/0096 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | B23Q7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM HALTEN, EINKLEMMEN UND POSITIONIEREN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2023/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR HOLD, CLAMP AND POSITION OBJECTS | [2023/27] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR MAINTENIR, SERRER ET POSITIONNER DES OBJETS | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0858862 (STARK EMIL JR [AT]); | [A]WO2013125326 (KANEMATSU MINORU [JP]); | [A]JP5895337B ; | [A]US10635758 (PIVAC MARK [AU]) | International search | [A]EP0858862 (STARK EMIL JR [AT]); | [A]WO2013125326 (KANEMATSU MINORU [JP]); | [A]JP2019147214 (ADVANCED TELECOMMUNICATION RES INST INT) |