EP3868785 - ANTI-CD28 HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES FORMULATED FOR ADMINISTRATION TO HUMANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSE Immunotherapeutics 22, boulevard Benoni Goullin 44200 Nantes / FR | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANHOVE, Bernard 72bis rue Henri Barbusse 44400 Rézé / FR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Duffield, Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21150940.1 | 15.12.2016 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | EP20150200281 | 15.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15200281 | EP20160306537 | 22.11.2016 Original published format: EP 16306537 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868785 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P37/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C07K16/2818 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/47 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K47/60 (US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01035 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HUMANISIERTE ANTI-CD28-ANTIKÖRPER ZUR VERABREICHUNG AN MENSCHEN | [2021/34] | English: | ANTI-CD28 HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES FORMULATED FOR ADMINISTRATION TO HUMANS | [2021/34] | French: | ANTICORPS HUMANISÉS ANTI-CD28 FORMULÉS POUR UNE ADMINISTRATION À DES HUMAINS | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 22.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16822423.6 / EP3390450 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2011101791 (TCL PHARMA [FR], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular claims 1-10 and examples 1-6 *; | [XI] - Bas-Bernardet Le ET AL, "75 PRECLINICAL EVALUATION OF FR104, AN ANTAGONIST ANTI-CD28 MONOVALENT FAB'ANTIBODY, IN A SKIN INFLAMMATORY DTH PRIMATE MODEL", 11th World Congress On Inflammation, IAIS Abstracts Natal 2013, (20130921), URL: http://static.springer.com/sgw/documents/1427011/application/pdf/IAIS+Abstracts+Natal+2013.pdf, (20160421), XP055267462 [X] 11-13,15 * the whole document * [I] 1-10,14 | [XI] - N. POIRIER ET AL, "Selective CD28 Antagonist Blunts Memory Immune Responses and Promotes Long-Term Control of Skin Inflammation in Nonhuman Primates", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20151123), vol. 196, no. 1, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1501810, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 274 - 283, XP055266685 [X] 11-13,15 * page 275, column l, paragraphs 2, 3, 5 - page r, paragraph 1 * * discussion; page 276, column r, paragraph 2; figures 2, 6 * [I] 1-10,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1501810 | [XI] - "Project Final Report: TRIAD (Tolerance Restoration in Autoimmune Diseases by selective manipulation of the CD28 costimulatory pathway", (20150410), URL: http://cordis.europa.eu/docs/results/281/281493/final1-triad-report-ce-final-20150410-final.pdf, (20160420), XP055266941 [X] 11-13,15 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 6 * * page 16, paragraph 6 * * page 20, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 9 * [I] 1-10,14 | [XI] - K. G. HAANSTRA ET AL, "Selective Blockade of CD28-Mediated T Cell Costimulation Protects Rhesus Monkeys against Acute Fatal Experimental Autoimmune Encephalomyelitis", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20150215), vol. 194, no. 4, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1402563, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1454 - 1466, XP055266682 [X] 11-13,15 * the whole document, in particular page 1455, left-hand column, fourth paragraph - right-hand column, first paragraph * [I] 1-10,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1402563 | [A] - POIRIER NICOLAS ET AL, "Advantages of Papio anubis for preclinical testing of immunotoxicity of candidate therapeutic antagonist antibodies targeting CD28", MABS, LANDES BIOSCIENCE, US, (20140501), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 697 - 706, XP009189665 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SUCHARD SUZANNE J ET AL, "A monovalent anti-human CD28 domain antibody antagonist: preclinical efficacy and safety", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20131101), vol. 191, no. 9, ISSN 1550-6606, pages 4599 - 4610, XP002765099 [A] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular discussion * | by applicant | WO2011101791 | US8785604 | - BOWEN, M.ARMSTRONG, N.MAA, Y.-F., "Investigating high-concentration monoclonal antibody powder suspension in nonaqueous suspension vehicles for subcutaneous injection", J. Pharm. Sci., (20120000), vol. 101, doi:10.1002/jps.23324, pages 4433 - 4443, XP055070252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.23324 | - FINDLAY LEASTWOOD DSTEBBINGS RSHARP GMISTRY YBALL C et al., "Improved in vitro methods to predict the in vivo toxicity in man of therapeutic monoclonal antibodies including TGN1412", J Immunol Methods, (20100000), vol. 352, pages 1 - 12, XP026808302 | - HAANSTRA KG.DIJKMAN K.BASHIR N. et al., "Selective Blockade of CD28-Mediated T Cell Costimulation Protects Rhesus Monkeys against Acute Fatal Experimental Autoimmune Encephalomyelitis", J Immunol, (20150114), page 1402563 | - HALEY PJ, "Small molecule immunomodulatory drugs: challenges and approaches for balancing efficacy with toxicity", Toxicol Pathol, (20120000), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 261 - 266 | - JACKISCH, C.MIILLER, V.MAINTZ, C.HELL, S.ATASEVEN, B., "Subcutaneous Administration of Monoclonal Antibodies in Oncology", Geburtshilfe Frauenheilkd, (20140000), vol. 74, doi:10.1055/s-0034-1368173, pages 343 - 349, XP055344155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0034-1368173 | - MELICHAR, B.STUDENTOVA, H.KALABOVA, H.VITASKOVA, D., "Role of subcutaneous formulation of trastuzumab in the treatment of patients with HER2-positive breast cancer", Immunotherapy, (20140000), vol. 6, pages 811 - 819 | - OHRESSER MOLIVE DVANHOVE BWATIER H, "Risk in drug trials", Lancet, (20060000), vol. 368, no. 9554, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(06)69883-8, pages 2205 - 6, XP025093799 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(06)69883-8 | - POIRIER, N.DILEK, N.MARY, C. et al., "FR104, an Antagonist Anti-CD28 Monovalent Fab' Antibody, Prevents Alloimmunization and Allows Calcineurin Inhibitor Minimization in Nonhuman Primate Renal Allograft", Am J Transplant, (20150000), no. 1, pages 88 - 100 | - POIRIER, N.MARY, C.DILEK, N. et al., "Preclinical efficacy and immunological safety of FR104, an antagonist anti-CD28 monovalent Fab' antibody", Am J Transplant, (20120000), no. 10, doi:10.1111/j.1600-6143.2012.04164.x, pages 2630 - 40, XP055110877 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-6143.2012.04164.x | - POIRIER, N.MARY, C.LE BAS-BERNADET, S., N. et al., "Advantages of Papio anubis for preclinical testing of immunotoxicity of candidate therapeutic antagonist antibodies targeting CD28", MAbs, (20140000), no. 3, pages 697 - 707 | - SHIAO SLMCNIFF JMMASUNAGA TTAMURA KKUBO KPOBER JS, "Immunomodulatory properties of FK734, a humanized anti-CD28 monoclonal antibody with agonistic and antagonistic activities", Transplantation, (20070000), vol. 83, no. 3, pages 304 - 13 | - SHPILBERG, O.JACKISCH, C., "Subcutaneous administration of rituximab (MabThera) and trastuzumab (Herceptin) using hyaluronidase", Br. J. Cancer, (20130000), vol. 109, doi:10.1038/bjc.2013.371, pages 1556 - 1561, XP002782443 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/bjc.2013.371 | - STEBBINGS RFINDLAY LEDWARDS CEASTWOOD DBIRD CNORTH D et al., "Cytokine storm' in the phase I trial of monoclonal antibody TGN1412: better understanding the causes to improve pre-clinical testing of immunotherapeutics", J Immunol., (20070000), vol. 179, pages 3325 - 3331 | - SUNTHARALINGAM GPERRY MRWARD SBRETT SJCASTELLO-CORTES ABRUNNER MDPANOSKALTSIS N, "Cytokine storm in a phase 1 trial of the anti-CD28 monoclonal antibody TGN1412", N Engl J Med, (20060000), vol. 355, no. 10, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa063842, pages 1018 - 28, XP002559375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa063842 | - WEINBLATT, M.E.SCHIFF, M.VALENTE, R.VAN DERHEIJDE, D.CITERA, G.ZHAO, C.MALDONADO, M.FLEISCHMANN, R., "Head-to-head comparison of subcutaneous abatacept versus adalimumab for rheumatoid arthritis: findings of a phase IIIb, multinational, prospective, randomized study", Arthritis Rheum, (20130000), vol. 65, pages 28 - 38 |