EP3903804 - DE NOVO BINDING DOMAIN CONTAINING POLYPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subdomain, LLC 3142 Quesada Street NW Washington, DC 20015 / US | For all designated states Arcellx, Inc. 20271 Goldenrod Lane Suite 2099 Germantown, MD 20876 / US | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAFLEUR, David, William NW Washington, DC 20015 / US | 02 /
HILBERT, David, M. Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21155053.8 | 04.04.2016 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | US201562143772P | 06.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562143772 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903804 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/10, C40B40/10, A61K38/00, C07K5/00, C07K7/00, C07K16/00, C07K16/10, C07K14/435, G01N33/574, A61K38/17, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, A61K39/00, A61K35/00, A61P35/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/435 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (CN);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/001104 (US);
A61K39/00111 (US);
A61K39/001112 (US);
A61K39/001113 (US);
A61K39/001124 (US);
A61K39/001129 (US);
A61K39/001168 (US);
A61K39/001171 (US);
A61K39/001186 (US);
A61K39/001188 (US);
A61K39/001195 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/4631 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/464402 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/464411 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/464412 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/464413 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/464419 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/00 (CN);
C07K14/70575 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/1027 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/3007 (CN);
C40B40/10 (IL,US);
A61K2239/29 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K39/0011 (US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (CN);
C07K2317/567 (CN);
C07K2318/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2319/035 (IL,US);
C07K2319/21 (IL,US);
C07K2319/41 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DE-NOVO-BINDUNGSDOMÄNE MIT POLYPEPTIDEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/44] | English: | DE NOVO BINDING DOMAIN CONTAINING POLYPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/44] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES CONTENANT UN DOMAINE DE LIAISON DE NOVO ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 29.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16777107.0 / EP3280432 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014271582 (FORMAN STEPHEN [US], et al); | by applicant | US4522811 | WO8605807 | WO8901036 | EP0404097 | US5122464 | US5208020 | WO9311161 | US5223409 | US5338665 | US5350674 | US5374548 | US5399331 | US5432018 | US5498530 | US5500362 | US5541087 | US5585362 | WO9640987 | WO9711971 | US5726044 | US5733731 | WO9815833 | US5821337 | US5922545 | WO9942077 | WO0070023 | WO0129058 | WO0145746 | US6326193 | WO0196584 | WO03056914 | WO03078614 | US2004009530 | WO2004024927 | WO2004057002 | WO2004058820 | WO2004074455 | US6815184 | WO2005017148 | WO2006020114 | WO2006130834 | US2007148167 | WO2007106585 | US2009110753 | US7842476 | WO2012079000 | WO2014028776 | US19690603441 | US19690603657 | US19470603680 |