EP3848180 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ROTATIONAL 3D PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratasys Ltd. 1 Holtzman Street Science Park P.O. Box 2496 7612401 Rehovot / IL | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menchik, Guy 42 Asher Street 4355321 RaAnana / IL | 02 /
Carlson, Andrew James 142 17th Avenue N Hopkins, MN 55353 / US | 03 /
Hedlund, Jonathan Bennhard 9778 Pierce Street NE Blaine, MN 55434 / US | 04 /
Campion, Kevin Ready 15400 Highland Heights Drive Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | 05 /
Simon, Robert Earl 17100 28th Avenue N Plymouth, MN 55447 / US | 06 /
Peterson, Nathaniel Michael 11216 Vera Cruz Ave N. Champlin, MN 55316 / US | 07 /
Beaver, Scott Wayne 969 Fortune Rd. San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | 08 /
Levin, Evgeni 7 Levona Street 7635029 Rehovot / IL | 09 /
Libinson, Alexander 4/14 Goldstein Street 5849519 Holon / IL | 10 /
Bressler, Yoav 22 Refidim Street 6998243 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [2023/19] |
Former [2021/28] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 21160273.5 | 13.07.2015 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US201462023897P | 13.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462023897 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848180 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3848180 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/112, B29C64/171, B29C64/314, B29C64/393, B29C64/241, B33Y30/00, B41J2/175 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B29C64/112 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C64/171 (EP,IL);
B29C64/20 (IL,KR,US);
B29C64/241 (EP,IL,US);
B29C64/245 (US);
B29C64/314 (EP,IL,US);
B29C64/393 (EP,IL,US);
B33Y10/00 (IL,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM 3D-ROTATIONSDRUCK | [2021/28] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ROTATIONAL 3D PRINTING | [2021/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION 3D ROTATIONNELLE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15821817.2 / EP3166774 | EP19167262.5 / EP3524406 | Divisional application(s) | EP22217392.4 / EP4177041 | EP22217398.1 / EP4194177 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | IE | 13.07.2023 | LU | 13.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60151056 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [Y]US2006127153 (MENCHIK GUY [IL], et al); | [Y]US2008042321 (RUSSELL DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2009141106 (TAKAGI YUKI [JP]); | [XY]US2013155157 (HARVEY DAVID C [US], et al); | [XP]EP2883708 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US5768134 | US6259962 | US6569373 | US6658314 | US6850334 | US7183335 | US7209797 | US7225045 | US7291002 | US7300619 | US7364686 | US2008109102 | US7500846 | US7658976 | US7962237 | US8172562 | US2013040091 | US9031680 |