EP3869312 - USER INTERFACES FOR MANAGING CONTROLLABLE EXTERNAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRIGAN, Taylor G. Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
COFFMAN, Patrick L. Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
FOSS, Christopher Patrick Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21160991.2 | 24.03.2020 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | US201962855895P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855895 P | US201916584743 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US201916584743 | US201916586002 | 27.09.2019 Original published format: US201916586002 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869312 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0485, G06F3/01, G06F3/16, H04M1/72415, H04L12/28 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/016 (EP,CN);
H04R5/04 (US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0482 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/04847 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/0485 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,CN);
G06F3/165 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/167 (EP,CN);
G06F9/4411 (EP);
G06F9/453 (EP);
H04L12/2809 (US);
H04L12/2812 (US);
H04L12/2814 (US);
H04L12/2816 (EP,CN);
H04L12/282 (US);
H04M1/72415 (EP);
G06F2203/04105 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLEN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON STEUERBAREN EXTERNEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/34] | English: | USER INTERFACES FOR MANAGING CONTROLLABLE EXTERNAL DEVICES | [2021/34] | French: | INTERFACES UTILISATEUR POUR LA GESTION DE DISPOSITIFS EXTERNES POUVANT ÊTRE COMMANDÉS | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/03] | 29.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20719301.2 / EP3769200 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3038427 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2016320849 (KOO BON-HYUN [KR]); | [A]US2017206779 (LEE HYE-JIN [KR], et al); | [XI]US2017357425 (SMITH BENJAMIN A [US], et al); | [A]US2017357434 (COFFMAN PATRICK L [US], et al) | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US7657849 | WO2013169849 | WO2014105276 | US19620609365 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20070968067 | US20080240788 | US20080241839 | US20090586862 | US20090620702 | US20090638251 | WO2013US40061 | WO2013US69483 |