EP3920003 - POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AUTONOMOUS DRIVING VEHICLE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Wendong Haidian Distict, Beijing / CN | 02 /
RUI, Xiaofei Haidian Distict, Beijing / CN | 03 /
WANG, Gang Haidian Distict, Beijing / CN | 04 /
SONG, Shiyu Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21164864.7 | 25.03.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | CN202010497244 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010497244 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920003 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G01C21/16, B60W60/00, G01S17/931, G06T7/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G05D1/0246 (EP,US);
B60W60/001 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/165 (CN,KR);
B60W30/18072 (KR);
B60W40/02 (KR);
G01C21/1656 (EP);
G01C21/18 (EP,CN,KR);
G01C21/20 (CN,KR);
G01C21/28 (CN,KR);
G05D1/027 (EP);
G05D1/0272 (EP);
G06F18/25 (US);
G06V20/56 (CN,KR,US);
B60W2050/0005 (KR);
B60W2050/002 (EP);
B60W2050/005 (KR);
B60W2420/403 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2420/905 (EP);
B60W2422/70 (US);
B60W2520/28 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2556/25 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -EINRICHTUNG, AUTONOM FAHRENDES FAHRZEUG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/49] | English: | POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AUTONOMOUS DRIVING VEHICLE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT, VÉHICULE DE CONDUITE AUTONOME, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2024 | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/25] | 15.02.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 10.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2017124781 (DOUILLARD BERTRAND ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] - [0068] - [0071] - [0075] , [ 104] - [0106]; figures 1,4,22 * [Y] 4-6 [I] 3,7,8,11; | [IY]US2019368879 (ROUMELIOTIS STERGIOS I [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0046] - [0077] - [0080] - [0094] , [0095] , [0105] - [0109]; figure 2 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y] - USENKO VLADYSLAV ET AL, "Direct visual-inertial odometry with stereo cameras", 2016 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), IEEE, (20160516), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2016.7487335, pages 1885 - 1892, XP032908405 [Y] 4-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2016.7487335 | [IY] - LIU JINXU ET AL, "Visual-Inertial Odometry Tightly Coupled with Wheel Encoder Adopting Robust Initialization and Online Extrinsic Calibration", 2019 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS (IROS), IEEE, (20191103), doi:10.1109/IROS40897.2019.8967607, pages 5391 - 5397, XP033695187 [I] 1-3,7-15 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS40897.2019.8967607 | [IY] - PENG GANG ET AL, "Robust tightly-coupled pose estimation based on monocular vision, inertia and wheel speed", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20200303), XP081613584 [I] 1-3,7-15 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6 |