EP4074428 - A ROTATABLE TOOL FOR CLEANING PIPES INTERNALLY AND A TOOL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boldan Oy Matkuntie 3 05200 Rajamäki / FI | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tukiainen, Joni 05200 Rajamäki / FI | 02 /
Suominen, Ville 05200 Rajamäki / FI | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Boco IP Oy Ab Kansakoulukatu 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21168083.0 | 13.04.2021 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074428 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/045, B24B5/06, B24B33/02, B24D9/04 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B08B9/045 (EP);
B24B33/02 (EP);
B24B5/06 (EP);
B24D9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHBARES WERKZEUG ZUR INNENREINIGUNG VON ROHREN UND WERKZEUGANORDNUNG | [2022/42] | English: | A ROTATABLE TOOL FOR CLEANING PIPES INTERNALLY AND A TOOL ASSEMBLY | [2022/42] | French: | OUTIL ROTATIF POUR LE NETTOYAGE INTERNE DES TUYAUX ET ENSEMBLE D'OUTILS | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5439410 (LARSSON SVANTE) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 49 *; | [A]WO0061988 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 16, line 1 - line 29 *; | [A]WO2020037080 (WELSH CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0050] *; | [A]DE202020101648U (SUKITUSTUKKU OY [FI]) [A] 1-8* the whole document * |