EP3878803 - MEMS TRANSDUCER FOR INTERACTING WITH A VOLUME FLOW OF A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHENK, Harald c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS, Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | 02 /
CONRAD, Holger c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS, Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | 03 /
GAUDET, Matthieu c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS, Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | 04 /
SCHIMMANZ, Klaus c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS, Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | 05 /
LANGA, Sergiu c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS, Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | 06 /
KAISER, Bert c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Photonische Mikrosysteme IPMS, Maria-Reiche-Str. 2 01109 Dresden / DE | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | König, Andreas Rudolf, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21168755.3 | 14.06.2016 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | DE201510210919 | 15.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015210919 | [2021/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878803 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B81C1/00, H04R9/02, H04R23/00, H04R19/00, H04R17/00, H04R15/00 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
B81C1/00182 (EP);
H04R19/005 (EP,KR,US);
B81B3/0021 (EP,US);
B81C1/00142 (US);
B81C1/0015 (US);
B81C1/00158 (KR,US);
H04R15/00 (EP,US);
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
H04R23/002 (EP,US);
H04R9/02 (EP,US);
B81B2201/0257 (EP,KR,US);
B81B2201/032 (EP);
B81B2201/036 (US);
B81B2201/054 (EP);
B81B2203/0109 (US);
B81B2203/0118 (US);
B81B2203/0127 (US);
B81B2203/0136 (US);
B81B2203/0172 (EP);
B81B2203/019 (US);
B81B2203/051 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/023 (EP,US);
H04R1/08 (EP,US);
H04R2201/003 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEMS-WANDLER ZUM INTERAGIEREN MIT EINEM VOLUMENSTROM EINES FLUIDS | [2021/37] | English: | MEMS TRANSDUCER FOR INTERACTING WITH A VOLUME FLOW OF A FLUID | [2021/37] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR MEMS PERMETTANT D'INTERAGIR AVEC UN DÉBIT VOLUMIQUE D'UN FLUIDE | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 15.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16729884.3 / EP3308555 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012018244 (ROBERT PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,9,12 * figures 2A-2C, 6 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0157] * [A] 3-7,10,11,14-16 [I] 13; | [XAI]WO03056691 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 30 * * page 9, line 11 - line 19 * [A] 3-12,14-16 [I] 13; | [A]DE102012223605 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1a, 1b,3a, 3b * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26] , [0 30] * | by applicant | US7803281 | EP2264058 | - "Bi-directional Electrostatic Microspeaker with Two Large-Deflection Flexible Membranes Actuated by Single/Dual Electrodes", ROBERTS, ROBERT C. et al., Sensors, IEEE, (20050000), pages 284 - 287 | - REHDER, J.ROMBACH, P.HANSEN, O., "Magnetic flux generator for balanced membrane loudspeaker", Sensors and Actuators A: Physical, (20020000), vol. 97, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0924-4247(01)00828-7, pages 61 - 67, XP004361583 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(01)00828-7 | - "A novel micromachined loudspeaker topology", NERI, F.DI FAZIO, F.CRESCENZI, R.BALUCANI, M., 61 st Conf. on Electronic Components and Technology, ECTC, IEEE, (20110000), pages 1221 - 1227 | - "CMOS-MEMS Acoustic Devices", NEUMANN, J. J.GABRIEL, K. J. et al., Advanced Micro and Nanosystems, Wiley-VCH Verlag, (20050000), vol. 2 | - SCHENK, H. et al., "A resonantly excited 2D-micro-scanning-mirror with large deflection", Sensors and Actuators A, (20010000), vol. 89, doi:10.1016/S0924-4247(00)00529-X, pages 104 - 111, XP004317252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(00)00529-X | - ROSA, M. A. et al., "A novel external electrode configuration for the electrostatic actuation of MEMS based devices", J. Micromech. Microeng., (20040000), doi:10.1088/0960-1317/14/4/003, pages 446 - 451, XP020069645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/14/4/003 | - KUMAR, V.SHARMA, N. N., "Design and Validation of Silicon-on-Insulator Based U Shaped thermal Microactuator", Int. J. Materials, Mechanics and Manufacturing, (20140000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 86 - 91 | - CHENG, MING-CHENG et al., "A lilicon microspeaker for hearing instruments", J. Micromech. Microeng., (20040000), vol. 14, doi:10.1088/0960-1317/14/7/004, pages 859 - 866, XP020069702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/14/7/004 |