EP3900989 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AIRCRAFT AUTOBRAKE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGIN, Marc Dayton, 45419 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 21169937.6 | 22.04.2021 | [2021/43] | Priority number, date | US202063014028P | 22.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063014028 P | US202117208938 | 22.03.2021 Original published format: US202117208938 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900989 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3900989 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B60T8/1703 (EP);
B64C25/426 (US);
B64D43/00 (US);
B64C25/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] |
Former [2021/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER AUTOMATISCHEN FLUGZEUGBREMSE | [2021/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AIRCRAFT AUTOBRAKE CONTROL | [2021/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE FREINAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'AÉRONEF | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 26.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5968106 (DEVLIEG GARRETT H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 38; figure 2 *; | [A]US2007132311 (GIAZOTTO ALESSANDRO R B [GB]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0061] - [0064]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP4655468B (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2982735 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP3348474 (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033]; figure 2 * |