EP3913648 - APPARATUS FOR OPERATING ELECTRIC SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Chao Beijing, 101149 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Hua Beijing, 100088 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Xiaoli Beijing, 102600 / CN | 04 /
YUAN, ZhiPeng Beijing, 100021 / CN | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/47] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 21172882.9 | 07.05.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | WO2020CN91065 | 19.05.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/091065 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913648 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913648 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/22, H01H3/26, H01H3/30, H01H9/28 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H01H3/26 (EP,US);
H01H3/42 (CN);
H01H3/227 (EP);
H01H3/3047 (EP);
H01H3/34 (CN);
H01H3/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINES ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTGERÄTES | [2022/42] | English: | APPARATUS FOR OPERATING ELECTRIC SWITCHING DEVICE | [2021/47] | French: | APPAREIL DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/47] |
Former [2021/47] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTGERÄTS | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 24.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | IE | 07.05.2023 | LU | 07.05.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.05.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE4142548 (ABB ENERGIE AG [AT]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,15-19 * column 2, line 11 - column 5, line 22; figures 1,2 * [Y] 14 [I] 8,12; | [A]FR2857500 (D ELECTRICITE SIELEC SOC IND [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [YA]WO2005050684 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [Y] 14 * pages 3-5; figure - * [A] 1 |