EP3920341 - CONNECTOR AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Japan G.K. 5-8, Hisamoto 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamane, Tomokazu Kawasaki, 213-8535 / JP | 02 /
Komatsu, Seiji Kawasaki, 213-8535 / JP | 03 /
Tokitsu, Ryutaro Toyota, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Matsuo, Kensuke Toyota, 471-8571 / JP | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21175150.8 | 21.05.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | JP20200097183 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020097183 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920341 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3920341 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629, H01R13/641, H01H9/08, H01H9/10, H01H85/20, // H01R13/696, H01R13/70, H01H85/02 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H01R13/62938 (EP,US);
H01H9/26 (CN);
H01H85/203 (EP);
H01H85/2045 (EP);
H01H9/10 (CN);
H01H9/102 (EP);
H01R13/02 (CN);
H01R13/40 (CN);
H01R13/631 (CN);
H01R13/64 (US);
H01R13/641 (EP);
H01R13/68 (CN);
H01R24/00 (CN);
H01H2009/108 (EP);
H01H85/0241 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | H01R13/629, H01R13/641, H01H9/08, // H01R13/696, H01R13/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDER UND STECKVERBINDERANORDNUNG | [2021/49] | English: | CONNECTOR AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY | [2021/49] | French: | CONNECTEUR ET ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2811586 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP]) | by applicant | JP2002343169 |