EP3934254 - ENCODING AND DECODING OF EXTRACTED FEATURES FOR USE WITH MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRICRI, Francesco Tampere / FI | 02 /
AKSU, Emre Baris Tampere / FI | 03 /
LE, Nam Hai Tampere / FI | 04 /
REZAZADEGAN TAVAKOLI, Hamed Espoo / FI | 05 /
ZHANG, Honglei Tampere / FI | 06 /
HANNUKSELA, Miska Matias Tampere / FI | 07 /
GHAZNAVI YOUVALARI, Ramin Tampere / FI | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21179915.0 | 17.06.2021 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | FI20200005687 | 29.06.2020 Original published format: FI 20205687 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934254 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/46, G06N3/04, H04N19/85 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP);
H04N19/85 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG VON EXTRAHIERTEN MERKMALEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN MASCHINEN | [2022/01] | English: | ENCODING AND DECODING OF EXTRACTED FEATURES FOR USE WITH MACHINES | [2022/01] | French: | CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES EXTRAITES À UTILISER AVEC DES MACHINES | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 11.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2018221863 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,10,14 * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraphs [0091] - [0099] * * claims 1, 6, 9 * [A] 3-9,12,13; | [XI] - EUNYONG SON (LGE) ET AL, "[VCM] CNN Intermediate feature coding for object detection", no. m54307, (20200627), 131. MPEG MEETING; 20200629 - 20200703; ONLINE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/131_OnLine/wg11/m54307-v4-m54307.zip m54307.docx, (20200627), XP030288604 [X] 1-3,7,10,14,15 * page 1 * * figure 2 * * pages 5-7, paragraph 2.5 * * figure 6 * [I] 4-6,8,9,11-13 | [A] - ZHUO CHEN ET AL, "[VCM]CNN Feature Map Coding for Cloud-based Visual Analysis", no. m52162, (20200107), 129. MPEG MEETING; 20200113 - 20200117; BRUSSELS; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/129_Brussels/wg11/m52162-v1-CNN_Feature_Map_Coding_for_Cloud_based_Visual_Analysis.zip CNN_Feature_Map_Coding_for_Cloud_based_Visual_Analysis.doc, (20200107), XP030224773 [A] 1-15 * page 5; figure 5 * | [A] - KIRCHHOFFER (FRAUNHOFER) H ET AL, "[NNR] CE4: Results on parameter optimization for DeepCABAC (method 18) and local scaling adaptation (method 19)", no. m54395, (20200622), 131. MPEG MEETING; 20200629 - 20200703; ONLINE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/131_OnLine/wg11/m54395-v1-m54395_HHI_CE4_Method_18_19.zip m54395_HHI_CE4_Method_18_19/m54395_HHI_CE4_Method_18_19.docx, (20200622), XP030288747 [A] 1-15 * pages 1, 2 * |