EP3933647 - CONSENSUS METHODS AND SYSTEMS IN CONSORTIUM BLOCKCHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alipay (Hangzhou) Information Technology Co., Ltd. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor, Section B Suite 801-11, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shuai Hangzhou, 310000 / CN | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21182641.7 | 30.06.2021 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | CN202010629725 | 03.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010629725 | [2022/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933647 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/64, H04L9/32, H04L9/00 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L63/12 (CN);
H04L9/3236 (US);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06Q10/06311 (CN);
H04L12/18 (CN);
H04L41/0893 (CN);
H04L67/1063 (US);
H04L67/1068 (US);
H04L67/108 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,CN,US);
H04L2209/34 (CN);
H04L2209/463 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | G06F21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSENSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEME IN KONSORTIUM BLOCKCHAIN | [2022/01] | English: | CONSENSUS METHODS AND SYSTEMS IN CONSORTIUM BLOCKCHAIN | [2022/01] | French: | MÉTHODES ET SYSTÈMES DE CONSENSUS DANS LA BLOCKCHAIN DE CONSORTIUM | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019377645 (ABRAHAM ITTAI [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * figures 2,3,4b *; | [A]US2020142765 (YANG DAYI [CN]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0103] ** figures 3a,3b,4,5A,5B,2c *; | [YA]US2020195444 (LIN PENG [CN]) [Y] 2,3,9 * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0131] * * figures 4,5 * [A] 1,4-8,10; | [IAY] - MIGUEL CASTRO ET AL, "Practical byzantine fault tolerance and proactive recovery", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS (TOCS), (20021101), vol. 20, no. 4, doi:10.1145/571637.571640, ISSN 0734-2071, pages 398 - 461, XP058039451 [I] 1,4-6,8,10 * figures 2,3,4 * * page 415, paragraph 2 * * page 411, paragraphs second-last * * page 412, paragraph 1 * * page 411, paragraph last * * page 412, paragraph 2 * * page 402, paragraph 2 * [A] 7 [Y] 2,3,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/571637.571640 |