EP3954536 - A TISSUE SUBSTITUTE MULTILAYER MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nurami Medical Ltd 13 Wadi El Haj Street 1603610 Nazareth / IL | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NSEIR MANASSA, Nora 3505361 Haifa / IL | 02 /
BAHAR, Amir 3603302 Kiryat-Tivon / IL | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21182717.5 | 17.12.2014 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201361916829P | 17.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361916829 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954536 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, B32B5/02, B32B7/12, B32B7/02, A61L27/18, A61L27/34, A61L31/10, A61L27/50, A61L31/06, A61L31/14, A61L15/26, A61L15/42, A61L15/58 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61L15/26 (EP,US);
A61L15/42 (EP,US);
A61L15/425 (US);
A61L15/58 (EP,US);
A61L17/12 (US);
A61L24/0015 (US);
A61L24/0036 (US);
A61L24/043 (US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP);
A61L27/48 (US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (US);
A61L31/041 (US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61L31/146 (US);
B29C48/0021 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/142 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (US);
B29C66/7315 (US);
B32B37/10 (US);
B32B37/144 (US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/024 (EP,US);
B32B5/12 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (US);
D04H1/728 (US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
B29K2067/04 (US);
B29K2067/046 (US);
B29K2667/04 (US);
B29K2667/046 (US);
B29K2995/0046 (US);
B29L2031/7532 (US);
B32B2250/03 (US);
B32B2250/20 (US);
B32B2250/244 (US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2255/102 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2307/542 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2535/00 (EP,US);
C08L2203/02 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/26, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | B32B5/26, B32B5/24, B32B5/02, B32B7/02, B32B27/36, B32B27/02, B32B27/08, C08L67/04, A61L27/18, A61L27/34, A61L31/10, A61L27/50, A61L31/06, A61L31/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE GEWEBEERSATZMATRIX | [2022/07] | English: | A TISSUE SUBSTITUTE MULTILAYER MATRIX | [2022/07] | French: | MATRICE MULTICOUCHE EN TANT QUE SUBSTITUT TISSULAIRE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14872209.3 / EP3083233 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004087227 (TISSUEMED LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 5-15 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 32 * * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 27 * * page 18, line 30 - page 19, line 12 * * page 20, line 4 - page 21, line 1 * * page 23, lines 10-28 * * page 26, line 30 - page 27, line 4 ** claim - *; | [I] - TOMOKAZU MUKAI ET AL, "Development of Watertight and Bioabsorbable Synthetic Dural Substitutes", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, US, (20080601), vol. 32, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1525-1594.2008.00567.x, ISSN 0160-564X, pages 473 - 483, XP055352394 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1525-1594.2008.00567.x | by applicant | US6514291 | EP1741456 | US2009004239 | EP2163269 | US2010233115 | US2013197663 | US8795708 | - WANG et al., J Biomed Mater Res B Applied Biomater, (20130000), vol. 101, pages 1359 - 1366 | - KURPINSKIPATEL, Nanomedicine, (20110000), vol. 6, pages 325 - 337 |