EP3936472 - PROCESS FOR RECOVERY AND SEPARATION OF BROMINE AND WATER FROM OXIDATION OF HYDROGEN BROMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reaction 35, LLC 861 Ward Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAYCUILIS, John Santa Barbara, 93111 / US | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21184174.7 | 07.07.2021 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | US202063050624P | 10.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063050624 P | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3936472 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3936472 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B7/09 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C01B7/096 (EP,CN,US);
B01J19/02 (EP);
B01J8/025 (EP);
B01J8/0285 (EP);
B01J8/0496 (EP,US);
C01B5/00 (CN);
F25J3/08 (CN);
B01J2208/00256 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00265 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG UND ABTRENNUNG VON BROM UND WASSER AUS DER OXIDATION VON BROMWASSERSTOFF | [2022/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR RECOVERY AND SEPARATION OF BROMINE AND WATER FROM OXIDATION OF HYDROGEN BROMIDE | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION ET DE SÉPARATION DE BROME ET D'EAU À PARTIR DE L'OXYDATION DU BROMURE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3379506 (JOACHIM MASSONNE, et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 12 *; | [YA]WO9306038 (CATALYTICA INC [US]) [Y] 10,12 * page 13, lines 3-19 * * page 14, line 5 - page 16, line 30 * * page 18, line 3 - page 19, line 10 * [A] 11; | [YA]US2011015458 (WAYCUILIS JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 10,12 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1,22,24 * * paragraphs [0089] , [0090] , [0094] , [0095] , [0101] , [0107] - [0118] * [A] 1-8,11; | [A]US2013090504 (ROSCOE JOHN C [NO], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0031] , [0112] , [0114] , [0119] , [0120] *; | [A]US10016701 (GROSSO PHILIP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * claims 13-16 * * figure 8 * * column 4, lines 20-65 * |