EP3973892 - INCISIONLESS GASTRIC BYPASS DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GT Metabolic Solutions, Inc. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGNER, Michel Scarsdale, 10583 / US | 02 /
BLAESER, David, J. Brooklyn Park, 10813 / US | 03 /
KRINKE, Todd, A. Buffalo, 55313 / US | 04 /
HAARSTAD, Philip, J. Chanhassen, 55317 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 21194195.0 | 15.07.2010 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | US200922590109P | 15.07.2009 Original published format: US 22590109 P | US200922622509P | 16.07.2009 Original published format: US 22622509 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973892 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/221 (US);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00296 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00336 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0034 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00358 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1117 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1139 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2926 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR EINEN INZISIONSLOSEN MAGEN-BYPASS | [2022/13] | English: | INCISIONLESS GASTRIC BYPASS DEVICES | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE PONTAGE GASTRIQUE SANS INCISION | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10800565.3 / EP2453811 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1438738 (VORONEZH POLT I [SU]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 9 *; | [A]US5690656 (COPE CONSTANTIN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2760627 (POZZI JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6632229 (YAMANOUCHI EIGORO [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 13, line 66 - column 16, line 60; figures 15-19 *; | [A]US2007173878 (HEUSER RICHARD R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract; figure - *; | [A]US2007260214 (MIKKAICHI TAKAYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract; figure - *; | [A]US2008051626 (SATO MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract; figures 1,19,20,54A-59 * * paragraphs [0167] , [0168] , [0228] - [0239] *; | [Y]WO2009082710 (ENDOMETABOLIC SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract; figures 1-7,37-39 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0047] - [0067] - [0071] * | by applicant | US2008208224 | US20010612259 |