EP3954384 - GENOTYPE STRATIFICATION IN DIABETES TREATMENT AND PREVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamyd Medical AB Kungsgatan 29 111 56 Stockholm / SE | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSEN-MÖLLER, Anders 115 25 Stockholm / SE | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 21195581.0 | 10.09.2018 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | SE20170051094 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: SE 1751094 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954384 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K33/08, A61P3/10, A61P37/02, G01N33/564, C12Q1/6883 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K39/0008 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K38/28 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (EA);
A61P3/10 (EP,EA,KR);
A61P37/02 (EP,EA,KR);
G01N33/564 (EP,EA,KR,US);
G01N33/56977 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,EA);
A61K2039/55 (EP,EA);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,EA);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,KR);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,EA,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GENOTYPSTRATIFIZIERUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG UND VORBEUGUNG VON DIABETES | [2022/07] | English: | GENOTYPE STRATIFICATION IN DIABETES TREATMENT AND PREVENTION | [2022/07] | French: | STRATIFICATION DU GÉNOTYPE DANS LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PRÉVENTION DU DIABÈTE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 16.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18854165.0 / EP3678692 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ERLICH H. ET AL, "HLA DR-DQ Haplotypes and Genotypes and Type 1 Diabetes Risk: Analysis of the Type 1 Diabetes Genetics Consortium Families", DIABETES, US, vol. 57, no. 4, doi:10.2337/db07-1331, ISSN 0012-1797, (20080401), pages 1084 - 1092, URL: https://diabetes.diabetesjournals.org/content/diabetes/57/4/1084.full.pdf, XP055873928 [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * table 6 * [I] 2,5,7,9-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/db07-1331 | [I] - BONIFACIO EZIO ET AL, "Effects of High-Dose Oral Insulin on Immune Responses in Children at High Risk for Type 1 Diabetes : The Pre-POINT Randomized Clinical Trial", JAMA THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, vol. 313, no. 15, doi:10.1001/jama.2015.2928, ISSN 0098-7484, (20150421), pages 1541 - 1549, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.2015.2928, XP055874125 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1548, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.2015.2928 | [I] - EZIO BONIFACIO ET AL, "Supplement 1: Pre-POINT STUDY PROTOCOL Pre-POINT (Primary Oral INsulin Trial) (Effects of High-Dose Oral Insulin on Immune Responses in Children at High Risk for Type 1 Diabetes : The Pre-POINT Randomized Clinical Trial)", JAMA THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, vol. 313, no. 15, doi:10.1001/jama.2015.2928, ISSN 0098-7484, (20150421), pages 1 - 55, URL: https://cdn.jamanetwork.com/ama/content_public/journal/jama/933762/jpc150002supp1_prod.pdf?Expires=1642699285&Signature=Atpcu1dHeGPQMG1m8LxwqRU8MSEQUIOTFUxQCfIaty~MBMgPusMVaI9~f4QaXHcTk0dBUHNyAeVMWr1a5HK4oxOAaSq9pEyZxCtCd5swPMDQopon0XPuweM2p0P9QhJF0lomRCMzqh3K2CvJtygBq5nx7-HjJq7m4oCkZRv5Fzry0tZo2Qls, XP055874154 [I] 1-11 * page 2 - page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.2015.2928 | [I] - BONIFACIO EZIO ET AL, "Supplementary Online Content: Effects of High-Dose Oral Insulin on Immune Responses in Children at High Risk for Type 1 Diabetes : The Pre-POINT Randomized Clinical Trial", JAMA THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, vol. 313, no. 15, doi:10.1001/jama.2015.2928, ISSN 0098-7484, (20150421), pages 1 - 13, URL: https://cdn.jamanetwork.com/ama/content_public/journal/jama/933762/jpc150002supp2_prod.pdf?Expires=1642699285&Signature=bnVkzdGoQVvmrYHd29J~ALlPCv5SOLFcTLhtRMgY8SaZ3eHHG8J~at~DJNuw-K2r72JoWjdVmQWjDiPYYsNliPh7yG4D9NkVqplgfYm-pNiDUQQEGtZ1nRJUQExZ~fcfOIkEqS1gcOWRv7idkxZnddw~t5I1p53Rx3JrMOQfssPtoM0lIGJC, XP055874153 [I] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.2015.2928 | [I] - NANTO-SALONEN K ET AL, "Nasal insulin to prevent type 1 diabetes in children with HLA genotypes and autoantibodies conferring increased risk of disease: a double-blind, randomised controlled trial", THE LANCET, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 372, no. 9651, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(08)61309-4, ISSN 0140-6736, (20081115), pages 1746 - 1755, (20081113), XP025658173 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1748, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1748, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 1753, column r, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(08)61309-4 | [AD] - JOHNNY LUDVIGSSON ET AL, "GAD65 antigen therapy in recently diagnosed type 1 diabetes mellitus", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20120202), vol. 366, no. 5, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1107096, pages 433 - 442, XP055434070 [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * page 441, column r, paragraph l * * tables 1,2 * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1107096 | [A] - LUDVIGSSON JOHNNY ET AL, "GAD-treatment of children and adolescents with recent-onset type 1 diabetes preserves residual insulin secretion after 30?months : The GAD-Alum Phase II and III Trials", DIABETES/METABOLISM RESEARCH AND REVIEWS, GB, (20140701), vol. 30, no. 5, doi:10.1002/dmrr.2503, ISSN 1520-7552, pages 405 - 414, XP055796913 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dmrr.2503 | [T] - HANNELIUS ULF ET AL, "Efficacy of GAD-alum immunotherapy associated within recently diagnosed type 1 diabetes", DIABETOLOGIA, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 63, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00125-020-05227-Z, ISSN 0012-186X, (20200805), pages 2177 - 2181, (20200805), XP037238798 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-020-05227-z | by applicant | EP1755631 | EP3151853 | - LUDVIGSSON et al., N Engl J Med., (20120202), vol. 366, no. 5, pages 433 - 42 | - ALI et al., Sci Transl Med., (20170809), vol. 9, no. 402 | - KRISCHER et al., Diabetologia, (20150500), vol. 58, no. 5, pages 980 - 7 | - WHERRETT DK et al., Lancet, (20110723), vol. 378, no. 9788, pages 319 - 27 | - TAVIRA et al., Journal of Diabetes Research, vol. 2018 |